14.08.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] |
05.10.2007 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] |
24.08.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2007 [2007/39] |
06.04.2007 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 09.05.2007 [2007/19] |
14.04.2006 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 31.05.2006 [2006/22] |
22.03.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.01.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
14.01.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
02.12.2005 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.11.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.09.2005 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.05.2005 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 13.07.2005 [2005/28] |
26.05.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.05.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.03.2005 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 11.05.2005 [2005/19] |
24.03.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
23.11.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.11.2004 |
New entry: Request for decision: receipt of request |
|
23.11.2004 |
New entry: Request for decision: result |
|
26.10.2004 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
21.05.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.05.2004 |
First examination report |
|
11.05.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.12.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.02.2004 [2004/07] |
26.12.2003 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.02.2004 [2004/07] |
05.12.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.12.2003 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
03.12.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.04.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.03.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.12.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.11.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.11.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|