15.06.2007 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] |
16.02.2007 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.11.2006 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
01.09.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.09.2006 |
First examination report |
|
30.12.2005 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 15.02.2006 [2006/07] |
08.11.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.09.2005 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.10.2005 [2005/43] |
09.09.2005 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.10.2005 [2005/43] |
08.04.2005 |
Change - inventor |
published on 25.05.2005 [2005/21] |
27.12.2004 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
27.12.2004 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
03.11.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.08.2004 |
Change - inventor |
published on 29.09.2004 [2004/40] |
02.07.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.08.2004 [2004/34] |
02.07.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.08.2004 [2004/34] |
25.06.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.06.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.05.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.05.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.03.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.05.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.05.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.12.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|