Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7319093 | Global Dossier | 15.01.2008 | B2 | US2005065108 | 24.03.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IL14614201 | 24.10.2001 | IL0200845 | 23.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2005508970 | Global Dossier | 07.04.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | IL14614201 | 24.10.2001 | IL0200845 | 23.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1446132 | Global Dossier | 15.02.2006 | A4 | EP1446132 | 18.08.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | IL14614201 | 24.10.2001 | IL0200845 | 23.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0206190 | 03.02.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | IL14614201 | 24.10.2001 | IL0200845 | 23.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2462250 | 01.05.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IL14614201 | 24.10.2001 | IL0200845 | 23.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ532171 | 24.02.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | IL14614201 | 24.10.2001 | IL0200845 | 23.10.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03034978 | Global Dossier | 11.03.2004 | A3 | WO03034978 | 01.05.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | IL14614201 | 24.10.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1575180 | 02.02.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | IL14614201 | 24.10.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200402697 | 06.06.2005 | B | Priority number | Date | IL14614201 | 24.10.2001 |