EP1446132 - ANTIDIABETIC 2-SUBSTITUTED-5'-O- (1-BORANOTRIPHOSPHATE) ADENOSINE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2007 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAR-ILAN UNIVERSITY 52900 Ramat Gan / IL | For all designated states The University of Montpellier I 5, boulevard Henri IV 34060 Montpellier / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states BAR-ILAN UNIVERSITY IL-52900 Ramat Gan / IL | ||
For all designated states The University of Montpellier I 5, boulevard Henri IV 34060 Montpellier / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FISCHER, Bilha 75 Aadulam Street 73142 Shoham / IL | 02 /
KLEIMAN-NAHUM, Victoria 8 Harashba 75483 Rishon LeTsion / IL | 03 /
PETIT, Pierre 8, rue Grand'Rue Jean Moulin 34000 Montpellier / FR | [2005/21] |
Former [2004/40] | 01 /
FISHER, Bilha 75 Aadulam Street 73142 Shoham / IL | ||
02 /
KLEIMAN-NAHUM, Victoria 8 Harashba 75483 Rishon LeTsion / IL | |||
03 /
PETIT, Pierre 8, rue Grand'Rue Jean Moulin 34000 Montpellier / FR | |||
Former [2004/34] | 01 /
FISHER, Bilha 75 Aadulam Street 73142 Shoham / IL | ||
02 /
KLEIMAN-NAHUM, Victoria 8 Harashba 75483 Rishon LeTsion / IL | |||
03 /
PETIT, Pierre 8, rue Grand'Rue Jean Moulin 34000 Montpellier / IL | Representative(s) | Grosset-Fournier, Chantal Catherine Grosset-Fournier & Demachy 54, rue Saint-Lazare 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/34] | Grosset-Fournier, Chantal Catherine Grosset-Fournier & Demachy, 54, rue Saint-Lazare 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02777766.3 | 23.10.2002 | [2004/34] | WO2002IL00845 | Priority number, date | IL20010146142 | 24.10.2001 Original published format: IL 14614201 | [2004/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03034978 | Date: | 01.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1446132 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.03.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/70, C07H19/167, C07H19/20, A61K31/7076, A61P3/10 | [2005/43] | CPC: |
C07H19/20 (EP,US);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/34] | A61K31/7052, A61K31/70, A61K31/69, C07H19/00, C07H19/16, C07H19/167 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTIDIABETISCHE 2-SUBSTITUIERTE-5'-O- (1-BORANOTRIPHOSPHAT) ADENOSIN-DERIVATE | [2004/34] | English: | ANTIDIABETIC 2-SUBSTITUTED-5'-O- (1-BORANOTRIPHOSPHATE) ADENOSINE DERIVATIVES | [2004/34] | French: | DERIVES ANTIDIABETIQUES DE 5'-O-(1-BORANOTRIPHOSPHATE) ADENOSINE-2-SUBSTITUEE | [2004/34] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2004 | Search fee paid | 30.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/34] | 05.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/29] | 22.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - HE K ET AL, "Synthesis and separation of diastereomers of ribonucleotide 5'-(alpha-P-borano)triophosphates", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, US, (1998), vol. 63, no. 17, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 5769 - 5773, XP002964120 [X] 1,13,15,17,18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo972002g | [DA] - FISCHER B ET AL, "2-Thioether 5'-O-(1-thiotriphosphate)adenosine derivatives as new insulin secretagogues acting through P2Y-receptors", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (1999), vol. 42, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 3636 - 3646, XP002171036 [DA] 1,20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm990158y | International search | [A]US5434143 (SPIELVOGEL BERNARD F [US], et al); | [X] - HE ET AL., "Synthesis and separation of diastereomers of ribonucleotide 5'-(alpha-P-borano)triophosphates", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1998), vol. 63, no. 17, pages 5769 - 5773, XP002964120 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo972002g | [A] - KOZARICH ET AL., "Ribonucleoside phosphates via phosphorimidazolidate intermediates. Synthesis of pseudoadenosine 5'-triphosphate", BIOCHEMISTRY, (1973), vol. 12, no. 22, pages 4458 - 4463, XP002964118 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00746a024 |