EP1446800 - WRITABLE HIGH-CAPACITY OPTICAL STORAGE MEDIA CONTAINING METAL COMPLEXES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2007 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.11.2007 [2007/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | [2004/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORTON, Colin Breisacherstrasse 30 CH-4057 Basel / CH | 02 /
YOUSAF, Taher Efringerstrasse 96 CH-4057 Basel / CH | 03 /
BUDRY, Jean-Luc Rue des Oeuches 52 CH-2842 Rossemaison / CH | 04 /
SCHMIDHALTER, Beat Dahlienstrasse 25 CH-4416 Bubendorf / CH | 05 /
SPAHNI, Heinz Eggstrasse 23 CH-4402 Frenkendorf / CH | [2004/34] | Application number, filing date | 02787590.5 | 07.11.2002 | [2004/34] | WO2002EP12425 | Priority number, date | CH20010002102 | 15.11.2001 Original published format: CH 21022001 | [2004/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03042990 | Date: | 22.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1446800 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/24, C07D487/22 | [2004/34] | CPC: |
C07D487/22 (EP,US);
B41M5/26 (KR);
G11B7/248 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESCHREIBBARE OPTISCHE SPEICHERMEDIEN MIT HOHER KAPAZITÄT, DIE METALLKOMPLEXE ENTHALTEN | [2004/34] | English: | WRITABLE HIGH-CAPACITY OPTICAL STORAGE MEDIA CONTAINING METAL COMPLEXES | [2004/34] | French: | SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE OPTIQUE INSCRIPTIBLE HAUTE CAPACITE CONTENANT DES COMPLEXES METALLIQUES | [2004/34] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/34] | 01.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/47] | 05.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH09309268 ; | [A]EP0623923 (TOYO INK MFG CO [JP]) [A] 1,7* page 21, line 32 - page 23, line 15; claims 1-3 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 07, Database accession no. 1998-071327(07), XP002229293 & JPH09309268 A 19971202 (MITSUBISHI) [X] 1,2,5,7-16 * abstract * |