EP1461709 - ACTIVATION OF PRODUCTS WITH EMBEDDED FUNCTIONALITY IN AN INFORMATION MANAGEMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.08.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.09.2011 [2011/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Anoto AB Box 4106 227 22 Lund / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/44] | For all designated states ANOTO AB Box 4106 227 22 Lund / SE | ||
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states Anoto AB Emdalavägen 18 223 69 Lund / SE | ||
Former [2005/12] | For all designated states Anoto IP Lic HB Scheelevägen 19C 223 70 Lund / SE | ||
Former [2004/40] | For all designated states Anoto AB Scheelevägen 19C 223 70 Lund / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIGNELL, Marten Skvaltvägen 4 s-240 10 Dalby / SE | [2004/40] | Representative(s) | Perklev, Karin Cecilia, et al Anoto AB Box 4106 227 22 Lund / SE | [2009/46] |
Former [2007/10] | Perklev, Karin Cecilia, et al Anoto AB Emdalavägen 18 223 69 Lund / SE | ||
Former [2004/40] | Perklev, Karin Cecilia Anoto Group AB, Scheelevägen 19C 223 70 Lund / SE | Application number, filing date | 02793711.9 | 20.12.2002 | [2004/40] | WO2002SE02411 | Priority number, date | SE20010004398 | 27.12.2001 Original published format: SE 0104398 | [2004/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03056437 | Date: | 10.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1461709 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 10.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/00, G06F3/00 | [2004/40] | CPC: |
G06F3/03545 (EP,SE,US);
G06F3/0317 (SE)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AKTIVIERUNG VON PRODUKTEN MIT EINGEBETTETER FUNKTIONALITÄT IN EINEM INFORMATIONSVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM | [2004/40] | English: | ACTIVATION OF PRODUCTS WITH EMBEDDED FUNCTIONALITY IN AN INFORMATION MANAGEMENT SYSTEM | [2004/40] | French: | ACTIVATION DE PRODUITS A FONCTIONNALITE INTEGREE DANS UN SYSTEME DE GESTION D'INFORMATIONS | [2004/40] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/40] | 21.11.2007 | Observations by third parties | 11.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/37] | 27.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.11.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2010 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 00/exclusive | For: | all designated states | Licencee: | LeapFrog Enterprises Inc. 6401 Hollis Street, Suite 150 Emeryville CA 94608-1070 / US | Date: | 30.05.2005 | [2005/31] | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9950736 (XEROX CORP [US], et al); | [A]WO9950787 (XEROX CORP [US], et al); | [X]WO0072133 (SILVERBROOK RES PTY LTD [AU], et al); | [A]WO0161449 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) | other | US5661506 | US5852434 |