Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006134446 | Global Dossier | 22.06.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004IB00288 | 29.01.2004 | EP03002206 | 31.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4965246B | Global Dossier | 04.07.2012 | B2 | JP2006517622 | 27.07.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004IB00288 | 29.01.2004 | EP03002206 | 31.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1592837 | Global Dossier | 03.04.2013 | B1 | EP1592837 | 09.11.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004IB00288 | 29.01.2004 | EP04706245 | 29.01.2004 | EP03002206 | 31.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0407041 | 22.09.2015 | B1 | BRPI0407041 | 17.01.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004IB00288 | 29.01.2004 | EP03002206 | 31.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2407433T | 12.06.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2004IB00288 | 29.01.2004 | EP03002206 | 31.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA05007610 | 30.09.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004IB00288 | 29.01.2004 | EP03002206 | 31.01.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004067831 | Global Dossier | 12.08.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP03002206 | 31.01.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101018601B | Global Dossier | 04.03.2011 | B1 | KR20050092793 | 22.09.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | EP03002206 | 31.01.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1443141 | Global Dossier | 04.08.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP03002206 | 31.01.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1738940 | 22.02.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | EP03002206 | 31.01.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1592837E | 06.05.2013 | E | Priority number | Date | EP03002206 | 31.01.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI288790B | 21.10.2007 | B | TW200420792 | 16.10.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | EP03002206 | 31.01.2003 |