EP1443141 - Non-yellowing aldehyde condensation products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.10.2004 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.12.2004 [2004/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant International Ltd. Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2004/32] | For all designated states CLARIANT INTERNATIONAL LTD. Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz / CH | Application number, filing date | 03002206.5 | 31.01.2003 | [2004/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1443141 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | D06M15/39, D06M15/41, D06P1/56, D06P5/08, C08G8/04, D06L3/10, C08G8/28 | [2004/32] | CPC: |
D06P5/08 (EP,KR,US);
D06M15/39 (EP,KR,US);
B41M5/3335 (EP,KR,US);
C08G8/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08G8/28 (EP,KR,US);
D06M15/41 (EP,KR,US);
D06M15/412 (EP,KR,US);
D06P1/56 (EP,KR,US);
D06M2101/34 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Nichtvergilbende Aldehydkondensationsprodukte | [2004/32] | English: | Non-yellowing aldehyde condensation products | [2004/32] | French: | Produits de condensation d'aldéhyde non jaunissants | [2004/32] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/50] | 08.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: A.91(5) [2004/50] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3446922 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,7,11* page 5, line 5 - page 7, line 5; claim - *; | [X]DE4401390 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1,6,7,10,11 * the whole document * |