EP1411456 - Method and apparatus for enabling distributed subscription services [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.02.2009 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 01.04.2009 [2009/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Patent Department Xerox Square - 20 A 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester, NY 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/17] | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Patent Department, Xerox Square - 20 A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester, New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Furst, Michael R. 268 Dartmouth Street Rochester, NY 14607 / US | 02 /
Rockwell, Ronald M. 67 Wilmer Street Rochester, NY 14607 / US | 03 /
Sharma Naveen 4 Colonial Drive Perinton, NY 14450 / US | 04 /
Fillion, Claude S. 97 Laurelwood Drive Rochester, NY 14626-3737 / US | 05 /
Kehoe, Michael P. 346 Rockingham Street Rochester, NY 14620-2156 / US | 06 /
Lorenzo, Arturo M. 8 Vanderberg Drive Fairport, NY 11450 / US | 07 /
McCorkingdale, Mary C. 55 Hulburt Avenue Fairport, NY 14450-2407 / US | 08 /
St. Jacques, Robert J. 104-3 Manorshire Drive Fairport, NY 14450 / US | 09 /
Thieret, Tracy E. 608 Shady Glen circle Webster, NY 14580 / US | 10 /
Austin, John C. . 209 Beresford Road Rochester, NY 14610 / US | 11 /
Daniels, Marc D. 120 Rock Creek Pittsford, NY 14534 / US | 12 /
Cananaugh, Michael F. 10 Staci Lane Webster, NY 14580 / US | 13 /
Huang, Weixia 60 Crittenden Boulevard, Appt. 830 Rochester, NY 14620 / US | 14 /
Regruit, Christopher J. 397 Alexander Street, Condo 16 Rochester, NY 14607 / US | 15 /
Whitfield, Loranzo 48 Havenwood Hollow Fairport, NY 14450 / US | [2004/17] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/17] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03023602.0 | 16.10.2003 | [2004/17] | Priority number, date | US20020319622P | 16.10.2002 Original published format: US 319622 P | US20020319623P | 17.10.2002 Original published format: US 319623 P | US20020319624P | 17.10.2002 Original published format: US 319624 P | US20020319625P | 17.10.2002 Original published format: US 319625 P | [2004/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1411456 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1411456 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | [2005/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60, G06F9/44 | [2005/27] | CPC: |
G06Q10/0875 (EP,US);
H04L67/10 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US)
|
Former IPC [2004/17] | G06F17/60 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/13] |
Former [2004/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Ermöglichen eines verteilten Abonnementsservices | [2004/17] | English: | Method and apparatus for enabling distributed subscription services | [2004/17] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour permettre des services abonnés distribués | [2004/17] | Examination procedure | 09.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/10] | 08.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.11.2008 | 04.11.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 12.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/14] | 18.11.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.11.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.11.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1061445 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] - [0009]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0011] - [0013] * * paragraphs [0015] - [0021]; figure 2 *; | [X]US6317748 (MENZIES STEVEN J [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 10; figure 1 * * column 5, line 27 - column 7, line 15; figures 2-4 * * column 7, lines 47-61 *; | [A]US6427168 (MCCOLLUM RAYMOND W [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 2, lines 5-57 * * column 4, line 61 - column 8, line 42; figures 2-4 *; | [A]US2002147611 (GREENE WILLIAM S [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0079] - [0172] *; | [A] - DISTRIBUTED MANAGEMENT TASK FORCE ET AL, "COMMON INFORMATION MODEL CIM SPECIFICATION V.2.2", ANNOUNCEMENT DISTRIBUTED MANAGEMENT TASK FORCE, (19990614), pages 1 - 105, XP002278401 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | [A] - THOMPSON P, "SUCCESSFUL PRACTICES IN DEVELOPING A COMPLEX INFORMATION MODEL", CONCEPTUAL MODELING-ER. INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON CONCEPTUAL MODELING, (19971103), pages 376 - 393, XP009040758 [A] 1,8-10 * the whole document * | Examination | US2002143924 |