Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4359485B | Global Dossier | 04.11.2009 | B2 | JP2004191365 | 08.07.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2002340930 | 25.11.2002 | JP2003387972 | 18.11.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6895359 | Global Dossier | 17.05.2005 | B2 | US2004107073 | 03.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2002340930 | 25.11.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1422491 | Global Dossier | 27.09.2017 | B1 | EP1422491 | 06.08.2008 | A3 | EP1422491 | 26.05.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2002340930 | 25.11.2002 |