EP1452104 - Method of producing an absorbent article and an absorbent article produced according to the method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCA Hygiene Products AB 405 03 Göteborg / SE | [2004/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Runeman, Bo Jons Väg 6 433 75 Jonsered / SE | 02 /
Farbrot, Anne Knapehall 44 436 39 Askim / SE | 03 /
Hjorth, Madeleine Raketgaten 10 413 20 Göteborg / SE | 04 /
Dovertie, Ralph Mastgaten 3 426 53 Västra Frölunda / SE | [2004/36] | Representative(s) | Andersson, Per Rune Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/30] | Andersson, Per Rune Albihns.Zacco AB P. O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2004/36] | Romare, Laila Anette Albihns Göteborg AB Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 03075613.4 | 28.02.2003 | [2004/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1452104 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1452104 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A43D25/18 | [2004/36] | CPC: |
A61F13/511 (EP,KR);
A61F13/15577 (EP,KR);
A61F13/8405 (EP,KR);
B05B7/0861 (EP,KR);
B05B7/10 (EP,KR);
B05C5/02 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/36] | Title | German: | Absorbierender Artikel und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [2004/36] | English: | Method of producing an absorbent article and an absorbent article produced according to the method | [2004/36] | French: | Procede de fabrication de produit absorbant et produit ainsi obtenu | [2004/36] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/17] | 03.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.04.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.02.2003 | AT | 20.04.2011 | BE | 20.04.2011 | CY | 20.04.2011 | CZ | 20.04.2011 | DK | 20.04.2011 | EE | 20.04.2011 | FI | 20.04.2011 | IT | 20.04.2011 | NL | 20.04.2011 | SE | 20.04.2011 | SI | 20.04.2011 | SK | 20.04.2011 | TR | 20.04.2011 | BG | 20.07.2011 | GR | 21.07.2011 | ES | 31.07.2011 | PT | 22.08.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 20.04.2011 | |
BE | 20.04.2011 | ||
CY | 20.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
IT | 20.04.2011 | ||
NL | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
TR | 20.04.2011 | ||
BG | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 20.04.2011 | |
BE | 20.04.2011 | ||
CY | 20.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
IT | 20.04.2011 | ||
NL | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
BG | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 20.04.2011 | |
BE | 20.04.2011 | ||
CY | 20.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
IT | 20.04.2011 | ||
NL | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 20.04.2011 | |
BE | 20.04.2011 | ||
CY | 20.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
NL | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 20.04.2011 | |
BE | 20.04.2011 | ||
CY | 20.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
NL | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | AT | 20.04.2011 | |
BE | 20.04.2011 | ||
CY | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
NL | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 20.04.2011 | |
BE | 20.04.2011 | ||
CY | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 20.04.2011 | |
CY | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | PT | 22.08.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4785996 (ZIECKER ROGER A [US], et al) [Y] 1,7* column 2, lines 26-35 *; | [Y]US5643588 (ROE DONALD CARROLL [US], et al) [Y] 1,7 * column 19, line 10 - column 20, line 24 *; | [AD]WO0048544 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [AD] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US6149934 (KRZYSIK DUANE GERARD [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0069484 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1250940 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document * |