18.07.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] |
18.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
14.06.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] |
04.05.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] |
24.02.2012 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] |
03.02.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.03.2012 [2012/10] |
27.01.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.02.2012 [2012/09] |
09.12.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.01.2012 [2012/02] |
02.12.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.01.2012 [2012/01] |
25.11.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.12.2011 [2011/52] |
18.11.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2011 [2011/51] |
11.11.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2011 [2011/50] |
04.11.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2011 [2011/49] |
21.10.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] |
18.03.2011 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 20.04.2011 [2011/16] |
08.03.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.01.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
25.01.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
17.09.2010 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
25.06.2010 |
Change - representative |
published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] |
04.03.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.02.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.11.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
01.11.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.07.2008 |
First examination report |
|
01.07.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.02.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.03.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.03.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.05.2005 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
04.05.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.04.2005 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 18.05.2005 [2005/20] |
30.03.2005 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
11.03.2005 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.04.2005 [2005/17] |
16.07.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.09.2004 [2004/36] |