Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4516063B | Global Dossier | 04.08.2010 | B2 | JP2006519320 | 24.08.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004EP02027 | 25.02.2004 | EP03075613 | 28.02.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1596795 | Global Dossier | 23.11.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004EP02027 | 25.02.2004 | EP03075613 | 28.02.2003 | EP04714327 | 25.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2004216480B | Global Dossier | 21.05.2009 | B2 | AU2004216480 | 10.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004EP02027 | 25.02.2004 | EP03075613 | 28.02.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA05008446 | 18.10.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004EP02027 | 25.02.2004 | EP03075613 | 28.02.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ541640 | 28.09.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004EP02027 | 25.02.2004 | EP03075613 | 28.02.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TNSN05207 | 11.06.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004EP02027 | 25.02.2004 | EP03075613 | 28.02.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004075798 | Global Dossier | 10.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP03075613 | 28.02.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20060002797 | Global Dossier | 09.01.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | EP03075613 | 28.02.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1452104 | Global Dossier | 20.04.2011 | B1 | EP1452104 | 01.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP03075613 | 28.02.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE505967T | 15.05.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP03075613 | 28.02.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60336794D1 | 01.06.2011 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP03075613 | 28.02.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ECSP055983 | 16.01.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | EP03075613 | 28.02.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PE20040881 | 03.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP03075613 | 28.02.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL377756 | 20.02.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP03075613 | 28.02.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2343892 | 20.01.2009 | C2 | RU2005130164 | 20.03.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | EP03075613 | 28.02.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200506340 | 31.05.2006 | B | Priority number | Date | EP03075613 | 28.02.2003 |