Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
04.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.09.2006 [2006/36] |
05.04.2006 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
31.01.2006 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
19.10.2005 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
11.03.2005 | Definitive list of designations | published on 27.04.2005 [2005/17] |
12.11.2004 | New entry: Fee payment for extension state | |
12.11.2004 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.12.2004 [2004/53] |
18.06.2004 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 04.08.2004 [2004/32] |