EP1442754 - Device for diffusing vapours into the environment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.08.2006 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.09.2006 [2006/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RE.LE.VI. S.P.A. Via Postumia, 1 46040 Rodigo (Mantova) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/32] | For all designated states RE.LE.VI. S.p.a. Via Postumia, 1 46040 Rodigo (Mantova) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pagani, Fabio, c/o RE.LE.VI.-S.P.A. 1, Via Postumia 46040 Rodigo (Mantova) / IT | [2004/32] | Representative(s) | Corradini, Corrado, et al Ing. C. Corradini & C. S.r.l. Via Dante Alighieri 4 42100 Reggio Emilia / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/32] | Corradini, Corrado, et al Studio Ing. C. CORRADINI & C. S.r.l. 4, Via Dante Alighieri 42100 Reggio Emilia / IT | Application number, filing date | 03079186.7 | 24.12.2003 | [2004/32] | Priority number, date | IT2003RE00011 | 31.01.2003 Original published format: IT RE20030011 | [2004/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1442754 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61L9/12, B60H3/00 | [2004/32] | CPC: |
A61L9/12 (EP);
A61L2209/133 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/32] | Extension states | AL | 03.11.2004 | LT | 03.11.2004 | LV | 03.11.2004 | MK | 03.11.2004 | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Dampfabgabe in die Umgebung | [2004/32] | English: | Device for diffusing vapours into the environment | [2004/32] | French: | Dispositif pour la diffusion de vapeurs dans l'environnement | [2004/32] | Examination procedure | 03.11.2004 | Examination requested [2004/53] | 24.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/36] | 11.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/36] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2005 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4995555 (WOODRUFF KEITH F [US]) [A] 1-7 * column 2, line 56 - column 4, line 7 * * column 4, line 39 - column 6, line 50; figures 1-9 *; | [A]FR2653979 (JOHNSON & SON INC S C [US]) [A] 1-7 * page 2, lines 1-25 * * page 3, line 26 - page 4, line 34 ** page 7, line 1 - page 8, line 18; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5172859 (PAGLIN NERIEL [IL], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 60; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5810253 (OHAYON NISSIM [IL]) [A] 1-7 * column 6, line 57 - column 7, line 54 * * column 9, line 4 - column 10, line 2 * * column 11, line 20 - column 12, line 22 * * column 13, line 47 - column 14, line 36; figure - * |