EP1441569 - Microwave oven [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2010 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.07.2010 [2010/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | ||
Former [2004/31] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-city, Kyungki-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Yoon Gon 334-506 ByeokSan Apt., 957-6 Youngtong-Dong Paldal-Gu, Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | [2004/31] | Representative(s) | Kohler, Janet Wendy Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax, West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/51] | Kohler, Janet Wendy Appleyard Lees, 15 Clare Road Halifax, West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | ||
Former [2004/31] | Robinson, Ian Michael Appleyard Lees, 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 03253771.4 | 13.06.2003 | [2004/31] | Priority number, date | KR20030005182 | 27.01.2003 Original published format: KR 2003005182 | [2004/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1441569 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1441569 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | [2007/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1441569 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/80 | [2004/31] | CPC: |
A47J37/0807 (EP,US);
F24C15/18 (KR);
H05B6/80 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/13] |
Former [2004/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mikrowellenherd | [2004/31] | English: | Microwave oven | [2004/31] | French: | Four à micro-ondes | [2004/31] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2003 | Examination requested [2004/31] | 21.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS62297634 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4,25,26,28 * the whole document *; | [X]JPH01305231 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP, et al) [X] 1,2,10,11,25,26,30 * the whole document *; | [X]JPH024131 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP, et al) [X] 1,3,10,25,27 * abstract *; | [X]JPH03271630 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC HOME APPL, et al) [X] 1,2,25,26,30 * figure 2 *; | [A]EP1213948 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1,10-12,25* figures 1,4 * | by applicant | JPS62297634 | JPH01305231 | JPH024131 | JPH03271630 |