EP1455263 - Power management in a computer system with network communications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.2009 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/37] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fierri, Adrien 13 rue Chaboud 73000 Chambery / FR | [2004/37] | Representative(s) | Lloyd, Richard Graham Hewlett Packard Espanola, SL Legal Department Cami de Can Graells, 1-21 08174 Saint Cugat del Vallés Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Lloyd, Richard Graham Hewlett Packard CCF IP Section - Legal Department 5, Avenue Raymond Chanas-Eybens 38053 Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2004/37] | Lloyd, Richard Graham Hewlett-Packard France Intellectual Property Section Etablissement de Grenoble 38053 Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 03290544.0 | 06.03.2003 | [2004/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1455263 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/32 | [2004/37] | CPC: |
G06F1/3209 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/37] | Title | German: | Leistungsverwaltung in einem Computersystem mit Netzwerkkommunikation | [2004/37] | English: | Power management in a computer system with network communications | [2004/37] | French: | Gestion d'énergie dans un système informatique avec des communications par réseau | [2004/37] | Examination procedure | 04.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/18] | 19.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/13] | 04.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5241542 (NATARAJAN KADATHUR S [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8-12,14,15 * column 1, line 16 - column 38 * * column 2, line 28 - column 10, line 37; figure - * [A] 6,13; | [A]US6256742 (KONAKA YOSUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,6-8,13-15 * column 1, line 9 - line 50 * * column 2, line 31 - line 48 ** column 5, line 32 - column 10, line 44; figures 1A-3 * |