EP1381255 - Towel drier with self-heating bars [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Muller et Compagnie 107 boulevard Ney 75018 Paris / FR | For all designated states Arribas, Cécilio 8, Rue Ampère 02006 Laon / FR | [2006/39] |
Former [2004/03] | For all designated states Muller et Compagnie 107 boulevard Ney 75018 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Arribas, Cécilio (Décédé) 8, Rue Ampère 02006 Laon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arribas, Cécilio décédé / FR | [2004/03] | Representative(s) | Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie, et al SCHMIT CHRETIEN 8, Place du Ponceau 95000 Cergy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/50] | Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie, et al SCHMIT-CHRETIEN-SCHIHIN 8, place du Ponceau 95000 Cergy / FR | ||
Former [2004/03] | Thébault, Jean-Louis Cabinet Thébault 111 cours du Médoc 33300 Bordeaux / FR | Application number, filing date | 03362009.7 | 08.07.2003 | [2004/03] | Priority number, date | FR20020008813 | 12.07.2002 Original published format: FR 0208813 | [2004/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1381255 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1381255 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H05B3/16, A47K10/06 | [2004/03] | CPC: |
H05B3/16 (EP);
A47K10/06 (EP);
F24H3/002 (EP);
H05B3/42 (EP);
H05B2203/014 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/03] | Title | German: | Handtuchtrockner mit selbstheizenden Stäben | [2004/03] | English: | Towel drier with self-heating bars | [2004/03] | French: | Radiateur sèche-serviettes à barres autochauffantes | [2004/03] | Examination procedure | 02.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 03.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.03.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 18.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05300674.8 / EP1607032 | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.09.2006 | CY | 27.09.2006 | CZ | 27.09.2006 | EE | 27.09.2006 | RO | 27.09.2006 | SI | 27.09.2006 | SK | 27.09.2006 | TR | 27.09.2006 | BG | 27.12.2006 | SE | 27.12.2006 | GR | 28.12.2006 | PT | 13.03.2007 | HU | 28.03.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
CY | 27.09.2006 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2006 | ||
EE | 27.09.2006 | ||
RO | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
GR | 28.12.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/38] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
CZ | 27.09.2006 | ||
EE | 27.09.2006 | ||
RO | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
GR | 28.12.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
CZ | 27.09.2006 | ||
RO | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
GR | 28.12.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
CZ | 27.09.2006 | ||
RO | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
CZ | 27.09.2006 | ||
IT | 27.09.2006 | ||
RO | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/40] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
CZ | 27.09.2006 | ||
IT | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
CZ | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CZ | 27.09.2006 | |
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | SI | 27.09.2006 | |
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2494861 (ALBERT CHAPMAN GEORGE) [Y] 1-8 * column 1, line 1 - line 6 * * column 2, line 49 - line 52 * * column 3, line 8 - line 20 *; | [A]GB2212037 (PEARCE KELVIN) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO0124582 (IBIDEN CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-8* abstract * |