EP1470686 - METHOD FOR PROVIDING MULTIPLE SDP MEDIA FLOWS IN A SINGLE PDP CONTEXT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.10.2009 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/44] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OYAMA, Johnson 1-11-51-103, Kamirenjaku Mitaki-shi, Tokyo 181-0012 / JP | 02 /
OLSSON, Magnus Smabjörksvägen 47 163 42 Spanga / SE | [2004/44] | Representative(s) | Tonscheidt, Andreas Ericsson GmbH Ericsson Allee 1 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Tonscheidt, Andreas Ericsson GmbH Ericsson Allee 1 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | ||
Former [2005/13] | Tonscheidt, Andreas, Dr. Ericsson GmbH Patent Department Ericsson Allee 1 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | ||
Former [2004/44] | Meyer, Jochen Ericsson GmbH, Ericsson Allee 1 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | Application number, filing date | 03702587.1 | 31.01.2003 | [2004/44] | WO2003EP00993 | Priority number, date | US20020352548P | 31.01.2002 Original published format: US 352548 P | [2004/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03065680 | Date: | 07.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1470686 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L12/56, H04L12/28, H04L12/64 | [2004/44] | CPC: |
H04L65/103 (EP,US);
H04L12/14 (EP,US);
H04L12/6418 (EP,US);
H04L47/70 (EP,US);
H04L47/762 (EP,US);
H04L47/808 (EP,US);
H04L47/824 (EP,US);
H04L65/1016 (EP,US);
H04L65/104 (EP,US);
H04L65/1069 (EP,US);
H04L65/1104 (EP);
H04L65/4015 (EP,US);
H04L65/65 (EP,US);
H04L67/14 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04W28/02 (EP);
H04W76/15 (EP,US);
H04W8/04 (US);
H04W80/10 (EP,US);
H04L2012/6456 (EP,US);
H04L2012/6459 (EP,US);
H04L2012/6486 (EP,US);
H04L65/1101 (US);
H04L69/24 (EP,US);
H04L69/327 (EP,US);
H04L69/329 (EP,US);
H04W76/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BEREITSTELLEN MEHRERER SDP-MEDIENFLÜSSE IN EINEM PDP KONTEXT | [2004/44] | English: | METHOD FOR PROVIDING MULTIPLE SDP MEDIA FLOWS IN A SINGLE PDP CONTEXT | [2004/44] | French: | PROCEDE POUR GENERER DES FLUX MULTIPLES DE SUPPORTS SDP DANS UN CONTEXTE POP UNIQUE | [2004/44] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/44] | 04.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 09.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.07.2009 | 30.06.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 01.07.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.07.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/48] | 12.07.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - 3GPP, "3rd Generation Partnership Project;Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects (Release 5)", 3GPP TS 23.207 V5.2.0, (20020107), pages 1 - 47, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Specs/archive/23_series/23.207/23207-520.zip, (20030513), XP002241078 [X] 1-6 * page 12 - page 14 * * page 17 - page 20 * * page 43 - page 46 * | [X] - 3GPP, "3rd Generation Partnership Project;Technical Specification Group Core Network; Signalling flows for the IP multimedia call control based on SIP and SDP; Stage 3 (Release 5)", 3GPP TS 24.228 V1.9.0, (20020122), pages 1 - 30, 69-88, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Specs/archive/24_series/24.228/24228-190.zip, (20030513), XP002241079 [X] 1-6 * page 17 - page 20 * * page 28 - page 29 * * page 69 - page 80 * |