EP1497052 - PORTABLE HYDRAULIC CRIMPING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FCI 145/147 Rue Yves Le Coz 78000 Versailles / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/03] | For all designated states FCI 145-147 rue Yves Le Coz 78000 Versailles / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEFAVOUR, John, David 10 Pearson Street Litchfield, NH 03052 / US | 02 /
STELTZER, Gordon, Lewis 51 Langsford Road Kennebunkport, Maine 04046 / US | 03 /
SHLOPAK, Alexander 73 Fairways Street, 11 Bethlehem, NH 03574 / US | 04 /
FAUCHER, Thomas 447 Mast Road Manchester, NH 03102 / US | 05 /
CHADBOURNE, Christopher, Gilpin 18 Oriole Drive Nashua, NH 03063 / US | 06 /
AYER, John, Wayne P.O.Box 402 25 Waterman Road Weare, NH 03281 / US | 07 /
MONTMINY, Armand, Thomas 503 Oak Street Manchester, NH 03104 / US | [2005/15] |
Former [2005/03] | 01 /
LEFAVOUR, John, David 10 Pearson Street Litchfield, NH 03052 / US | ||
02 /
STELTZER, Gordon, Lewis 31 B Langan Drive Goffstown, NH 03045 / US | |||
03 /
SHLOPAK, Alexander 73 Fairways Street, 11 Bethlehem, NH 03574 / US | |||
04 /
FAUCHER, Thomas 447 Mast Road Manchester, NH 03102 / US | |||
05 /
CHADBOURNE, Christopher, Gilpin 18 Oriole Drive Nashua, NH 03063 / US | |||
06 /
AYER, John, Wayne 11 Clinton Court Merrimack, NH 03054 / US | |||
07 /
MONTMINY, Armand, Thomas 503 Oak Street Manchester, NH 03104 / US | Representative(s) | Regi, François-Xavier, et al FCI Département Propriété Industrielle 145/147, rue Yves Le Coz 78035 Versailles / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Regi, François-Xavier, et al FCI Département Propriété Industrielle 145/147, rue Yves Le Coz 78035 Versailles / FR | ||
Former [2008/30] | Regi, François-Xavier, et al FCI Intellectual Property Manager 145-147 rue Yves Le Coz 78035 Versailles Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2007/10] | van Looijengoed, Ferry Antoin Theodorus, et al De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2005/03] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03711612.6 | 14.03.2003 | [2005/03] | WO2003US08123 | Priority number, date | US20020125908 | 19.04.2002 Original published format: US 125908 | [2005/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03089165 | Date: | 30.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1497052 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B21D7/06, B21D41/04, B21J9/12, B25B27/10 | [2008/11] | CPC: |
B25B27/10 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53226 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/03] | B21D7/06, B21D41/04, B21J9/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRAGBARES HYDRAULISCHES CRIMPWERKZEUG | [2005/03] | English: | PORTABLE HYDRAULIC CRIMPING TOOL | [2005/03] | French: | OUTIL DE SERTISSAGE HYDRAULIQUE PORTATIF | [2005/03] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2004 | Search fee paid | 10.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/03] | 06.06.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US5062290 (HOOVER JOHN B [US]); | [X]US4947672 (PECORA GENNARO L [US], et al); | [Y]US4339942 (SVENSSON UNO); | [X]US4942757 (PECORA GENNARO L [US]); | [X]US2869407 (SWANSON EDWIN C); | [X]US5979215 (LEFAVOUR JOHN D [US], et al); | [X]US4823588 (BUSSEREAU MARCEL [FR], et al); | [A]US6276186 (FRENKEN EGBERT [DE]); | [A]US3786669 (LINES R); | [A]US3554000 (SCHWAB CHARLES J); | [A]US2821877 (SWANSON EDWIN C); | [A]US2729063 (EARL HOADLEY CYRUS); | [A]US2696850 (PETERSON KENNETH E) |