EP1490038 - HYBRID SYSTEM FOR SOLUBILIZING PHARMACEUTICALLY ACTIVE SUBSTANCES IN POLYMER MATRICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2010 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beiersdorf AG Unnastrasse 48 20245 Hamburg / DE | [2005/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIERLE, Jens Hönermoor 12 21147 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
GÄDE, Christian Königsberger Str. 73 21629 Neu Wulmstorf / DE | [2005/01] | Application number, filing date | 03722347.6 | 21.03.2003 | [2005/01] | WO2003EP02953 | Priority number, date | DE2002112864 | 22.03.2002 Original published format: DE 10212864 | [2005/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03080035 | Date: | 02.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1490038 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1490038 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/70 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61K9/7053 (EP,US);
A61K47/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Title | German: | MISCHSYSTEM ZUR LÖSLICHKEITSVERMITTLUNG VON PHARMAZEUTISCHEN WIRKSTOFFEN IN POLYMERMATRIZES | [2005/01] | English: | HYBRID SYSTEM FOR SOLUBILIZING PHARMACEUTICALLY ACTIVE SUBSTANCES IN POLYMER MATRICES | [2005/01] | French: | SYSTEME DE MELANGE POUR SOLUBILISER DES AGENTS ACTIFS PHARMACEUTIQUES DANS DES MATRICES POLYMERES | [2005/01] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/53] | 23.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 05.08.2009 | CZ | 05.08.2009 | DK | 05.08.2009 | EE | 05.08.2009 | FI | 05.08.2009 | IE | 05.08.2009 | IT | 05.08.2009 | NL | 05.08.2009 | RO | 05.08.2009 | SE | 05.08.2009 | SI | 05.08.2009 | SK | 05.08.2009 | TR | 05.08.2009 | BG | 05.11.2009 | GR | 06.11.2009 | PT | 05.12.2009 | HU | 06.02.2010 | AT | 21.03.2010 | LU | 21.03.2010 | BE | 31.03.2010 | MC | 31.03.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | CY | 05.08.2009 | |
CZ | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
IE | 05.08.2009 | ||
IT | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
GR | 06.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
HU | 06.02.2010 | ||
AT | 21.03.2010 | ||
LU | 21.03.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 05.08.2009 | |
CZ | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
IE | 05.08.2009 | ||
IT | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
GR | 06.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
HU | 06.02.2010 | ||
AT | 21.03.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 05.08.2009 | |
CZ | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
IE | 05.08.2009 | ||
IT | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
GR | 06.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
AT | 21.03.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/43] | CZ | 05.08.2009 | |
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
IE | 05.08.2009 | ||
IT | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
GR | 06.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
AT | 21.03.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | CZ | 05.08.2009 | |
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
IE | 05.08.2009 | ||
IT | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
GR | 06.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | CZ | 05.08.2009 | |
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
IE | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
GR | 06.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | CZ | 05.08.2009 | |
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
IE | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | CZ | 05.08.2009 | |
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
IE | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | DK | 05.08.2009 | |
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
IE | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | FI | 05.08.2009 | |
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | FI | 05.08.2009 | |
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | FI | 05.08.2009 | |
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | FI | 05.08.2009 | |
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | FI | 05.08.2009 | |
SE | 05.08.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5702720 (EFFING JOCHEM [DE], et al) [A] 1-12* column 1, lines 35-62; examples 1-7; claims 1-18 *; | [A]US6221383 (MIRANDA JESUS [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 2, lines 44-55; examples 44-65; claims 1-4; table 2 * * column 33, lines 14-25 * |