EP1532205 - POLYESTER COMPOSITIONS FOR APPEARANCE PARTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2006 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington DE 19898 / US | ||
Former [2005/48] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | ||
Former [2005/21] | For all designated states E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOBAYASHI, Toshikazu 116 Millbrook Drive Chadds Ford, PA 19317 / US | 02 /
BRISSOT, Claire 48 boulevard Victor Hugo 77370 Nangis / FR | 03 /
FLEXMAN, Edmund, Arthur 10 Crestfield Road Wilmington, DE 19810 / US | [2006/21] |
Former [2005/21] | 01 /
KOBAYASHI, Toshikazu 116 Millbrook Drive Chadds Ford, PA 19317 / US | ||
02 /
BRISSOT, Claire Villa "La Fontaine" Apt 1.2, 600 rue de Fenieres F-01710 Thoiry / FR | |||
03 /
FLEXMAN, Edmund, Arthur 10 Crestfield Road Wilmington, DE 19810 / US | Representative(s) | Morf, Jan Stefan Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/21] | Morf, Jan Stefan, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Abitz & Partner, Poschingerstrasse 6 81679 München (Bogenhausen) / DE | Application number, filing date | 03749327.7 | 28.08.2003 | [2005/21] | WO2003US27425 | Priority number, date | US20020406474P | 28.08.2002 Original published format: US 406474 P | [2005/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004020520 | Date: | 11.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1532205 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1532205 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08L67/02, C08L73/00 | [2005/21] | CPC: |
C08L67/02 (EP,US);
C08L73/00 (EP,US);
C08K7/02 (EP,US);
C08K7/04 (EP,US);
C08K7/10 (EP,US);
C08L23/0869 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L67/02, C08L2666/06 (US,EP);
C08L67/02, C08L2666/14 (US,EP);
C08L67/02, C08L2666/22 (EP,US);
C08L73/00, C08L2666/18 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/29] |
Former [2005/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | POLYESTERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR TEILE MIT AUSSEHEN | [2005/21] | English: | POLYESTER COMPOSITIONS FOR APPEARANCE PARTS | [2005/21] | French: | COMPOSITIONS POLYESTER POUR PIECES DONT L'ASPECT EST PREPONDERANT | [2005/21] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/21] | 01.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/41] | IT | 30.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4140670 (CHARLES JOHN J, et al) [A] 3,5,7 * claims 1-12 *; | [A]EP0494422 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 3,5,7* abstract *; | [A]US5322908 (HAMAZAKI HIROHIDE [JP], et al); | [XA]DE10027161 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,8-17 * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 3; claims 1-7 * * page 17, line 34 - line 37 * [A] 3,5-7 |