18.09.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] |
17.07.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] |
12.06.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] |
06.02.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2009 [2009/11] |
06.06.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] |
30.05.2008 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 02.07.2008 [2008/27] |
23.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.06.2008 [2008/26] |
02.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] |
25.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] |
08.02.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.03.2008 [2008/11] |
25.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] |
22.06.2007 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 25.07.2007 [2007/30] |
21.06.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
21.06.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
16.03.2007 |
Change - representative |
published on 18.04.2007 [2007/16] |
09.02.2007 |
Change: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.02.2007 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.12.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
26.09.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.07.2006 |
First examination report |
|
13.07.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.06.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.02.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.11.2005 |
Change - extension states |
published on 11.01.2006 [2006/02] |
19.09.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.05.2005 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.06.2005 [2005/25] |
06.05.2005 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.06.2005 [2005/25] |
27.04.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.04.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.04.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.04.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.04.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.12.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|