Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7690120 | Global Dossier | 06.04.2010 | B2 | US2006032057 | 16.02.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10243690 | 20.09.2002 | DE0303050 | 13.09.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003271533 | Global Dossier | 19.04.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10243690 | 20.09.2002 | DE0303050 | 13.09.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1542838 | Global Dossier | 25.07.2007 | B1 | EP1542838 | 22.06.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10243690 | 20.09.2002 | DE0303050 | 13.09.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2497529 | 08.04.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10243690 | 20.09.2002 | DE0303050 | 13.09.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50307777D1 | 06.09.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE10243690 | 20.09.2002 | DE0303050 | 13.09.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004028761 | Global Dossier | 08.04.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10243690 | 20.09.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE367901T | 15.08.2007 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE10243690 | 20.09.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE10243690 | 14.09.2006 | B4 | DE10243690 | 08.04.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10243690 | 20.09.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2291671T | 01.03.2008 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE10243690 | 20.09.2002 |