EP1542838 - ARRANGEMENT FOR RETRO-ACTIVELY CUTTING WIPER BLADES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sieke, Harald Moserstrasse 6 64285 Darmstadt / DE | For all designated states Sieke, Martin Kiesstrasse 56 64283 Darmstadt / DE | [2005/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/25] | Representative(s) | Habermann Intellectual Property Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten mbB Dolivostraße 15A 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/16] | Katscher Habermann Patentanwälte Dolivostrasse 15A 64293 Darmstadt / DE | ||
Former [2005/25] | Gornott, Dietmar, Dipl.-Ing. Zilleweg 29 64291 Darmstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 03753303.1 | 13.09.2003 | [2005/25] | WO2003DE03050 | Priority number, date | DE20021043690 | 20.09.2002 Original published format: DE 10243690 | [2005/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004028761 | Date: | 08.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1542838 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1542838 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B26D3/28 | [2005/25] | CPC: |
B26D3/28 (EP,US);
B60S1/38 (EP,US);
B60S2001/3846 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/30] |
Former [2005/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG ZUM NACHSCHNEIDEN VON SCHEIBENWISCHERBL TTERN | [2005/25] | English: | ARRANGEMENT FOR RETRO-ACTIVELY CUTTING WIPER BLADES | [2005/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE RECOUPER DES RACLETTES D'ESSUIE-GLACES | [2005/25] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/25] | 15.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 25.07.2007 | DK | 25.07.2007 | EE | 25.07.2007 | FI | 25.07.2007 | RO | 25.07.2007 | SI | 25.07.2007 | SK | 25.07.2007 | TR | 25.07.2007 | MC | 30.09.2007 | BG | 25.10.2007 | GR | 26.10.2007 | PT | 26.12.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/34] | CY | 25.07.2007 | |
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
EE | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SI | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/29] | DK | 25.07.2007 | |
EE | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SI | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | DK | 25.07.2007 | |
EE | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | DK | 25.07.2007 | |
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/26] | DK | 25.07.2007 | |
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | DK | 25.07.2007 | |
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | FI | 25.07.2007 | |
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | BG | 25.10.2007 | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE3120679 (WEICHAND HANS ROLAND) [Y] 21,22 * figure - *; | [X]DE3509786 (KUEMMEL WILLI) [X] 1* the whole document *; | [Y]US4604802 (SAMUELSSON SOREN [US]) [Y] 25 * figure - *; | [DY]DE3510738 (MEITZEL HORST) [DY] 2,4-6,8-10,12,14-18,21-23,25-27,30-33 * the whole document *; | [DXY]DE8633841U (FRANZ FOTTNER GMBH) [DX] 1 * page 5, line 1 - line 6 * [Y] 2,4-6,8-10,12,14-18,21-23,25-27,30-33; | [Y]DE8716269U (WÜSTENBERG) [Y] 26 * figure - *; | [Y]DE4110799 (DIEBOLD MANFRED DIPL ING [DE]) [Y] 2,4-6,8-10,12,14-18,21-23,25-27,30-33 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE9311510U (HEFFNER ROLF DIETER [DE]) [Y] 27 * figures 4A,6 *; | [X]DE9405275U (STARKE GISELA [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE29606561U (WESSELS HELMUT [DE]) [Y] 2,4-6,8-10,12,14-18,30,33 * figure - *; | [XY]US5848471 (FREELAND JAY [US]) [X] 1,3,7,11,19,20,24,28,29 * column 3, line 10 - column 5, line 67 * [Y] 2,4-6,8-10,12,14-18,21-23,25-27,30-33 |