12.03.2010 |
Change - representative |
published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] |
27.06.2008 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] |
15.02.2008 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
04.01.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.08.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.08.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
23.03.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.03.2007 |
First examination report |
|
02.03.2007 |
Change - designated states |
published on 04.04.2007 [2007/14] |
02.03.2007 |
Change - extension states |
published on 04.04.2007 [2007/14] |
05.01.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.11.2006 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 06.12.2006 [2006/49] |
03.11.2006 |
Correction of patent application |
published on 06.12.2006 [2006/49] |
27.10.2006 |
Change - designated states |
published on 29.11.2006 [2006/48] |
01.09.2006 |
Change - designated states |
published on 04.10.2006 [2006/40] |
25.08.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.09.2006 [2006/39] |
25.08.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.09.2006 [2006/39] |
10.01.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.08.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.07.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.07.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.12.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|