EP1568149 - PROTECTIVE CIRCUIT FOR PROTECTION AGAINST OVERVOLTAGE FOR A CAN-BUS TRANSCEIVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2007 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/35] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOLZ, Stephan Lehenweg 14 93102 Pfatter / DE | [2005/35] | Application number, filing date | 03769235.7 | 09.10.2003 | [2005/35] | WO2003DE03348 | Priority number, date | DE2002151473 | 05.11.2002 Original published format: DE 10251473 | [2005/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004042950 | Date: | 21.05.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1568149 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1568149 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04B3/00, H02H9/00 | [2005/35] | CPC: |
H04L25/08 (EP,US);
H04B2203/547 (EP,US);
H04L25/0272 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2006/08] |
Former [2005/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SCHUTZSCHALTUNG ZUM SCHUTZ GEGEN ÜBERSPANNUNG FÜR EINEN CAN-BUS-TRANSCEIVER | [2005/35] | English: | PROTECTIVE CIRCUIT FOR PROTECTION AGAINST OVERVOLTAGE FOR A CAN-BUS TRANSCEIVER | [2005/35] | French: | CIRCUIT DE PROTECTION CONTRE LA SURTENSION POUR UN EMETTEUR-RECEPTEUR DE BUS CAN | [2005/35] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/35] | 27.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/50] |
Former [2007/41] | IT | 12.07.2006 | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0895438 (DEUTSCHE TELEPHONWERK KABEL [DE]) [DA] 1-7 * abstract * * column 2, line 5 - column 3, line 52 *; | [A]DE19944833 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 28 * * column 3, line 12 - line 15 * * column 4, line 36 - column 5, line 35 *; | [A]DE10102243 (XCELLSIS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * column 1, line 6 - line 41 ** column 4, line 60 - column 7, line 14 * |