EP1572659 - THE USE OF 4-PHENYL SUBSTITUTED TETRAHYDROISOQUINOLINES IN THE TREATMENT OF PAIN, MIGRAINE AND URINARY INCONTINENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.10.2008 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC 7000 Portage Road Kalamazoo, MI 49001 / US | [2007/04] |
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC 301 Henrietta Street Kalamazoo, MI 49001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRAIL, Donald Edward, Pfizer Global R&D 700 Chesterfield Parkway Chesterfield, MO 63117 / US | 02 /
ARNERIC, Stephen Peter, Pfizer Global R&D 2800 Plymouth Road Ann Arbor, Mi 48105 / US | 03 /
WISHKA, Donn Gregory, Pfizer Global R&D Eastern Point Road Groton, CT 06340 / US | 04 /
WONG, Erik Ho Fong, Pfizer Global R&D 2800 Plymouth Road Ann Arbor, MI 48105 / US | 05 /
BECK, James, Peter 1372 Robert Court Zionsville, IN 46077 / US | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Duncan, Garreth Andrew Pfizer Limited UK Patent Department Ramsgate Road Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/37] | Duncan, Garreth Andrew Pfizer Limited, UK Patent Department, Ramsgate Road Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03772562.9 | 25.11.2003 | [2005/37] | WO2003IB05455 | Priority number, date | US20020430298P | 02.12.2002 Original published format: US 430298 P | [2005/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004050629 | Date: | 17.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1572659 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07D217/04, C07D217/14, A61K31/472, A61P25/02, A61P25/04, A61P25/06, A61P13/00 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
A61K31/472 (EP,US);
A61K31/4741 (EP,US);
A61K31/4743 (EP,US);
A61K31/4745 (EP,US);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON 4-PHENYL SUBSTITUIERTEN TETRAHYDROISOCHINOLINEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON SCHMERZ, MIGRÄNE UND HARNINKONTINENZ | [2005/37] | English: | THE USE OF 4-PHENYL SUBSTITUTED TETRAHYDROISOQUINOLINES IN THE TREATMENT OF PAIN, MIGRAINE AND URINARY INCONTINENCE | [2005/37] | French: | UTILISATION DE TETRAHYDROISOQUINOLINES 4-PHENYLE SUBSTITUEES DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE LA DOULEUR, DE LA MIGRAINE ET DE L'INCONTINENCE URINAIRE | [2005/37] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 13.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/46] | 25.06.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4375471 (EFFLAND RICHARD C, et al) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1,30 *; | [Y]EP0330360 (ZAMBELETTI SPA L [IT]) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1,16 *; | [Y]WO9723458 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1,37 *; | [DY]WO0132624 (DU PONT PHARM CO [US]) [DY] 1-15 * claims 1,30,36,42 *; | [A] - YATSU TAKEYUKI ET AL, "Effect of YM435, a dopamine DA1 receptor agonist, in a canine model of ischemic acute renal failure", GENERAL PHARMACOLOGY, (199811), vol. 31, no. 5, ISSN 0306-3623, pages 803 - 807, XP002279432 [A] * page 803, abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0306-3623(98)00085-8 | [A] - JACOB J N ET AL, "DOPAMINE AGONIST PROPERTIES OF N ALKYL-4-3 4-DIHYDROXYPHENYL-1 2 3 4 TETRA HYDRO ISO QUINOLINES", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1981), vol. 24, no. 8, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 1013 - 1015, XP002279433 [A] * page 1013, abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00140a021 | Examination | WO0204455 |