EP1558690 - AQUEOUS ADHESIVE COMPOSITION BASED ON LEGUME STARCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.2014 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roquette Frères 62136 Lestrem / FR | [2005/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOMBERT, Hervé 476, rue Froide F-62232-HINGES / FR | 02 /
LADRET, Marika 2, rue de la Chapelle F-59840 Lompret / FR | 03 /
CORRIETTE, Pascal 33 rue Bournoville f-59660 Merville / FR | 04 /
HOUZE, Régis 3, Chemin Madame f-59551 Tourmingnies / FR | 05 /
BOUXIN, Christian 98, rue de L'arbe de Paradis f-59274 Marquillies / FR | [2005/31] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2008/35] | Boulinguiez, Didier Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2005/31] | Boulinguiez, Didier Cabinet Plasseraud 65/67 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 03778453.5 | 24.10.2003 | [2005/31] | WO2003FR03158 | Priority number, date | FR20020013910 | 06.11.2002 Original published format: FR 0213910 | [2005/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004044082 | Date: | 27.05.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1558690 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1558690 | Date: | 15.05.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C09J103/02 | [2005/31] | CPC: |
C09J103/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1018 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1025 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24694 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C09J103/02, C08L2666/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/31] | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGE KLEBSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG AUF BASIS VON STÄRKE VON LEGUMINOSEN | [2005/31] | English: | AQUEOUS ADHESIVE COMPOSITION BASED ON LEGUME STARCH | [2005/31] | French: | COMPOSITION ADHESIVE AQUEUSE A BASE D AMIDON DE LEGUMINEUSES . | [2005/31] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/31] | 22.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 24.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.12.2005 | Opposition(s) | 18.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.10.2003 | AT | 15.05.2013 | CY | 15.05.2013 | CZ | 15.05.2013 | EE | 15.05.2013 | MC | 15.05.2013 | NL | 15.05.2013 | RO | 15.05.2013 | SI | 15.05.2013 | SK | 15.05.2013 | TR | 15.05.2013 | BG | 15.08.2013 | GR | 16.08.2013 | PT | 16.09.2013 | GB | 24.10.2013 | IE | 24.10.2013 | LU | 24.10.2013 | BE | 31.10.2013 | CH | 31.10.2013 | LI | 31.10.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
CY | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
TR | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
GB | 24.10.2013 | ||
IE | 24.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
CY | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
GB | 24.10.2013 | ||
IE | 24.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
GB | 24.10.2013 | ||
IE | 24.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
GB | 24.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
GB | 24.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | PT | 16.09.2013 | Cited in | International search | [DX]US4587332 (LANE CHRISTOPHER C [CA], et al) [DX] 1 * column 9, line 51 - column 11, line 38 *; | [DX]US5454863 (FORAN MICHAEL T [US], et al) [DX] 1 * column 3, line 18 - line 22 * * column 5, line 17 *; | [A]US5641349 (KOUBEK TIMOTHY C [US], et al) [A] * column 8, line 20 - line 32 *; | [A]US3444109 (GOLICK ALEXANDER J, et al) [A] * column 5, line 29 - line 50 * | Examination | - F. W. COMER ET AL, "Purification, Modification, and Properties of Air-Classified Pea Starch", CEREAL CHEMISTRY, (19780101), vol. 55, pages 818 - 829, XP055002736 |