EP1539759 - NOVEL IMIDAZOPYRIDINES AND THEIR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/24] | USE OF AND SOME NOVEL IMIDAZOPYRIDINES | ||
[2006/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AstraZeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [2005/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHANSSON, Henrik AstraZeneca R & D Lund S-221 87 Lund / SE | 02 /
LAWITZ, Karolina AstraZeneca R & D Lund S-221 87 Lund / SE | 03 /
NIKITIDIS, Grigorios AstraZeneca R & D Lund S-221 87 Lund / SE | 04 /
SJÖ, Peter AstraZeneca R & D Lund S-221 87 Lund / SE | 05 /
STORM, Peter AstraZeneca R & D Lund S-221 87 Lund / SE | [2005/24] | Application number, filing date | 03788216.4 | 13.08.2003 | WO2003SE01279 | Priority number, date | SE20020002462 | 14.08.2002 Original published format: SE 0202462 | [2005/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004016611 | Date: | 26.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1539759 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1539759 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 26.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, A61K31/437, A61P37/08, A61P11/06 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4162 (KR);
A61K31/437 (EP,US);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/24] |
Former [N/P] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 14.03.2005 | LV | 14.03.2005 | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUE IMIDAZOPYRIDINE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2006/51] | English: | NOVEL IMIDAZOPYRIDINES AND THEIR USE | [2007/12] | French: | NOUVELLES IMIDAZOPYRIDINES ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2005/24] |
Former [2005/24] | VERWENDUNG VON IMIDAZOPYRIDINEN, UND EINIGE NEUE IMIDAZOPYRIDINE | ||
Former [2005/24] | USE OF AND SOME NOVEL IMIDAZOPYRIDINES | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 14.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 06.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.08.2007 | BE | 15.08.2007 | CY | 15.08.2007 | CZ | 15.08.2007 | DK | 15.08.2007 | EE | 15.08.2007 | FI | 15.08.2007 | NL | 15.08.2007 | RO | 15.08.2007 | SI | 15.08.2007 | SK | 15.08.2007 | TR | 15.08.2007 | BG | 15.11.2007 | GR | 16.11.2007 | PT | 15.01.2008 | HU | 16.02.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/34] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CY | 15.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SI | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
HU | 16.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CY | 15.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SI | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SI | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | FI | 15.08.2007 | |
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | NL | 15.08.2007 | |
BG | 15.11.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0049407 (THOMAE GMBH DR K [DE]); | [X]WO0196336 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US], et al) |