EP1585797 - ELECTROLUMINESCENT MATERIALS AND DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2009 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2008/44] |
Former [2006/51] | For all designated states OLED-T LIMITED Workzone Unit 2 8 Kinetic Crescent Innova Park Enfield EN3 7XH / GB | ||
Former [2005/42] | For all designated states Elam-T Limited Workzone Unit 2, 8 Kinetic Crescent, Innova Park Enfield EN3 7XH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATHIRGAMANATHAN, Poopathy The Little Lancaster House, 1Lancaster Road North Harrow HA2 7NN / GB | 02 /
PRICE, Richard Garden Flat, 5 Raleigh Road London N8 0JB / GB | 03 /
GANESHAMURUGAN, Subramaniam 135 Antill Road London N15 4BB / GB | 04 /
PARAMASWARA, Gnanamoly 19 Southway, Totteridge London N208EB / GB | 05 /
KUMARAVERL, Muttulingham 9 Fraser Road, Greenford Middlesex UB6 7AH / GB | 06 /
PARTHEEPAN, Arumugam 26 Eldertree Way Mitcham, Surrey CR4 1AG / GB | 07 /
SELVARANJAN, Selvadurai 285A Malden Road, Sutton Surrey SM3 8ET / GB | 08 /
ANTIPAN-LARA, Juan 29 Jenner Road London N16 7SB / GB | 09 /
SURENDRAKUMAR, Sivagnanasundram 16 Nolton Place, Edgware Middelesex HA8 6DL / GB | [2005/42] | Representative(s) | Lucas, Brian Ronald Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/42] | Lucas, Brian Ronald Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road GB-Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03789550.5 | 19.12.2003 | [2005/42] | WO2003GB05573 | Priority number, date | GB20020030072 | 24.12.2002 Original published format: GB 0230072 | [2005/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004058913 | Date: | 15.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1585797 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1585797 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/06, H05B33/14, H01L51/50 | [2008/35] | CPC: |
C09K11/06 (EP,US);
H10K85/30 (EP,US);
H05B33/14 (EP,US);
H10K50/11 (EP,US);
C09K2211/183 (EP,US);
H10K85/111 (EP,US);
H10K85/311 (EP,US);
H10K85/324 (EP,US);
H10K85/60 (EP,US);
H10K85/611 (EP,US);
H10K85/621 (EP,US);
H10K85/631 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/42] | C09K11/06, H05B33/14, H01L51/20, H01L51/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROLUMINESZENTE MATERIALIEN UND VORRICHTUNGEN | [2005/42] | English: | ELECTROLUMINESCENT MATERIALS AND DEVICES | [2005/42] | French: | MATERIAUX ET DISPOSITIFS ELECTROLUMINESCENTS | [2005/42] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/42] | 04.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 04.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/32] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 04.07.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 04.07.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.08.2008 | BE | 27.08.2008 | CY | 27.08.2008 | CZ | 27.08.2008 | DK | 27.08.2008 | EE | 27.08.2008 | FI | 27.08.2008 | IT | 27.08.2008 | NL | 27.08.2008 | RO | 27.08.2008 | SI | 27.08.2008 | SK | 27.08.2008 | TR | 27.08.2008 | BG | 27.11.2008 | SE | 27.11.2008 | GR | 28.11.2008 | ES | 08.12.2008 | IE | 19.12.2008 | LU | 19.12.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | PT | 27.01.2009 | HU | 28.02.2009 | [2010/49] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CY | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
TR | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IE | 19.12.2008 | ||
LU | 19.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
HU | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CY | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IE | 19.12.2008 | ||
LU | 19.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
HU | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IE | 19.12.2008 | ||
LU | 19.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IE | 19.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IE | 19.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 27.08.2008 | |
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | NL | 27.08.2008 | |
ES | 08.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9953724 (UNIV PRINCETON [US], et al); | JP2000030864 [ ] (MINOLTA CO LTD); | JP2000053957 [ ] (KOTO GIJUTSU KENKYUIN KENKYU K); | JP2001076879 [ ] (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); |