EP1525272 - USE OF BISMUTH COMPOUNDS AS BACTERICIDE IN AQUEOUS ELECTRODEPOSITION PAINTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/17] | AQUEOUS ELECTRODEPOSITION PAINTS, USE THEREOF IN METHODS FOR COATING ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE SUBSTRATES, AND USE OF BISMUTH COMPOUNDS IN SAID AQUEOUS ELECTRODEPOSITION PAINTS | ||
[2006/34] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 28.10.2011 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: ES | published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Coatings GmbH Glasuritstrasse 1 48165 Münster / DE | [2010/16] |
Former [2005/17] | For all designated states BASF Coatings AG Glasuritstrasse 1 48165 Münster / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROSSE-BRINKHAUS, Karl-Heinz Hagenstr. 90 48301 Nottuln / DE | 02 /
OTT, Günther von Holte Str. 101 A 48167 Münster / DE | 03 /
REUTER, Hardy An der Vogelrute 28 48167 Münster / DE | 04 /
KOEBBERT, Hans-Otto Buchenweg 5 48324 Sendenhorst / DE | [2005/17] | Representative(s) | Steffan & Kiehne Patentanwälte PartG mbB Burgplatz 21-22 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/48] | Leifert & Steffan Patentanwälte Burgplatz 21-22 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2008/40] | Leifert & Steffan Patentanwälte Postfach 10 40 09 40031 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2008/15] | Leifert & Steffan Patentanwälte Burgplatz 21-22 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2006/33] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2005/17] | Fitzner, Uwe, Dr., et al Lintorfer Strasse 10 40878 Ratingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03792207.7 | 17.07.2003 | [2005/17] | WO2003EP07747 | Priority number, date | DE20021036347 | 08.08.2002 Original published format: DE 10236347 | [2005/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004018570 | Date: | 04.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1525272 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1525272 | Date: | 31.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/05] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1525272 | Date: | 30.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/44 | [2005/17] | CPC: |
C09D5/4492 (EP,US);
C08K5/56 (EP,US);
C09D5/025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/17] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON BISMUTVERBINDUNGEN ALS BAKTERIZID IN WÄSSRIGEN ELEKTROTAUCHLACKEN | [2006/34] | English: | USE OF BISMUTH COMPOUNDS AS BACTERICIDE IN AQUEOUS ELECTRODEPOSITION PAINTS | [2006/34] | French: | UTILISATION DE COMPOSES A BASE DE BISMUTH COMME BACTERICIDES DANS LES PEINTURES AQUEUSES ELECTROPHORETIQUES PAR IMMERSION | [2006/34] |
Former [2005/17] | WÄSSRIGE ELEKTROTAUCHLACKE, IHRE VERWENDUNG IN VERFAHREN ZUR BESCHICHTUNG ELEKTRISCH LEITFÄHIGER SUBSTRATE SOWIE DIE VERWENDUNG VON BISMUTVERBINDUNGEN IN DIESEN WÄSSRIGEN ELEKTROTAUCHLACKEN | ||
Former [2005/17] | AQUEOUS ELECTRODEPOSITION PAINTS, USE THEREOF IN METHODS FOR COATING ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE SUBSTRATES, AND USE OF BISMUTH COMPOUNDS IN SAID AQUEOUS ELECTRODEPOSITION PAINTS | ||
Former [2005/17] | PEINTURE AQUEUSE ELECTROPHORETIQUE PAR IMMERSION, SON UTILISATION DANS UN PROCEDE DE REVETEMENT DE SUBSTRATS ELECTROCONDUCTEURS ET UTILISATION DE COMPOSES BISMUTH DANS CES PEINTURES AQUEUSES ELECTROPHORETIQUES PAR IMMERSION | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/17] | 05.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.10.2007
ADMISSIBLE DuPont Performance Coatings GmbH Christbusch 25 42285 Wuppertal / DE Opponent's representative Morf, Jan Stefan Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.10.2007
ADMISSIBLE DuPont Performance Coatings GmbH Christbusch 25 42285 Wuppertal / DE Opponent's representative Morf, Jan Stefan Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | 07.12.2007 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.06.2008 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.02.2011 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 16.02.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.03.2011 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 10.03.2011 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 05.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 17.10.2011 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 31.01.2007 | CZ | 31.01.2007 | DK | 31.01.2007 | EE | 31.01.2007 | FI | 31.01.2007 | GB | 31.01.2007 | IE | 31.01.2007 | IT | 31.01.2007 | NL | 31.01.2007 | RO | 31.01.2007 | SI | 31.01.2007 | SK | 31.01.2007 | TR | 31.01.2007 | SE | 30.04.2007 | BG | 01.05.2007 | GR | 01.05.2007 | PT | 02.07.2007 | AT | 17.07.2007 | LU | 17.07.2007 | BE | 31.07.2007 | CH | 31.07.2007 | LI | 31.07.2007 | MC | 31.07.2007 | HU | 01.08.2007 | FR | 01.08.2011 | [2013/36] |
Former [2013/23] | CY | 31.01.2007 | |
CZ | 31.01.2007 | ||
DK | 31.01.2007 | ||
EE | 31.01.2007 | ||
FI | 31.01.2007 | ||
GB | 31.01.2007 | ||
IE | 31.01.2007 | ||
IT | 31.01.2007 | ||
NL | 31.01.2007 | ||
RO | 31.01.2007 | ||
SI | 31.01.2007 | ||
SK | 31.01.2007 | ||
TR | 31.01.2007 | ||
SE | 30.04.2007 | ||
BG | 01.05.2007 | ||
GR | 01.05.2007 | ||
ES | 11.05.2007 | ||
PT | 02.07.2007 | ||
AT | 17.07.2007 | ||
LU | 17.07.2007 | ||
BE | 31.07.2007 | ||
CH | 31.07.2007 | ||
LI | 31.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
HU | 01.08.2007 | ||
FR | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/22] | CY | 31.01.2007 | |
CZ | 31.01.2007 | ||
DK | 31.01.2007 | ||
EE | 31.01.2007 | ||
FI | 31.01.2007 | ||
GB | 31.01.2007 | ||
IE | 31.01.2007 | ||
IT | 31.01.2007 | ||
NL | 31.01.2007 | ||
RO | 31.01.2007 | ||
SI | 31.01.2007 | ||
SK | 31.01.2007 | ||
TR | 31.01.2007 | ||
SE | 30.04.2007 | ||
BG | 01.05.2007 | ||
GR | 01.05.2007 | ||
PT | 02.07.2007 | ||
AT | 17.07.2007 | ||
LU | 17.07.2007 | ||
BE | 31.07.2007 | ||
CH | 31.07.2007 | ||
LI | 31.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
HU | 01.08.2007 | ||
FR | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2009/43] | CY | 31.01.2007 | |
CZ | 31.01.2007 | ||
DK | 31.01.2007 | ||
EE | 31.01.2007 | ||
FI | 31.01.2007 | ||
GB | 31.01.2007 | ||
IE | 31.01.2007 | ||
IT | 31.01.2007 | ||
NL | 31.01.2007 | ||
RO | 31.01.2007 | ||
SI | 31.01.2007 | ||
SK | 31.01.2007 | ||
TR | 31.01.2007 | ||
SE | 30.04.2007 | ||
BG | 01.05.2007 | ||
GR | 01.05.2007 | ||
PT | 02.07.2007 | ||
AT | 17.07.2007 | ||
LU | 17.07.2007 | ||
BE | 31.07.2007 | ||
CH | 31.07.2007 | ||
LI | 31.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
HU | 01.08.2007 | ||
Former [2009/40] | CY | 31.01.2007 | |
CZ | 31.01.2007 | ||
DK | 31.01.2007 | ||
EE | 31.01.2007 | ||
FI | 31.01.2007 | ||
GB | 31.01.2007 | ||
IE | 31.01.2007 | ||
IT | 31.01.2007 | ||
NL | 31.01.2007 | ||
RO | 31.01.2007 | ||
SI | 31.01.2007 | ||
SK | 31.01.2007 | ||
SE | 30.04.2007 | ||
BG | 01.05.2007 | ||
GR | 01.05.2007 | ||
PT | 02.07.2007 | ||
AT | 17.07.2007 | ||
LU | 17.07.2007 | ||
BE | 31.07.2007 | ||
CH | 31.07.2007 | ||
LI | 31.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CY | 31.01.2007 | |
CZ | 31.01.2007 | ||
DK | 31.01.2007 | ||
EE | 31.01.2007 | ||
FI | 31.01.2007 | ||
GB | 31.01.2007 | ||
IE | 31.01.2007 | ||
IT | 31.01.2007 | ||
NL | 31.01.2007 | ||
RO | 31.01.2007 | ||
SI | 31.01.2007 | ||
SK | 31.01.2007 | ||
SE | 30.04.2007 | ||
BG | 01.05.2007 | ||
GR | 01.05.2007 | ||
PT | 02.07.2007 | ||
AT | 17.07.2007 | ||
BE | 31.07.2007 | ||
CH | 31.07.2007 | ||
LI | 31.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | CZ | 31.01.2007 | |
DK | 31.01.2007 | ||
EE | 31.01.2007 | ||
FI | 31.01.2007 | ||
GB | 31.01.2007 | ||
IE | 31.01.2007 | ||
IT | 31.01.2007 | ||
NL | 31.01.2007 | ||
RO | 31.01.2007 | ||
SI | 31.01.2007 | ||
SK | 31.01.2007 | ||
SE | 30.04.2007 | ||
BG | 01.05.2007 | ||
GR | 01.05.2007 | ||
PT | 02.07.2007 | ||
AT | 17.07.2007 | ||
BE | 31.07.2007 | ||
CH | 31.07.2007 | ||
LI | 31.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/50] | CZ | 31.01.2007 | |
DK | 31.01.2007 | ||
FI | 31.01.2007 | ||
GB | 31.01.2007 | ||
IE | 31.01.2007 | ||
IT | 31.01.2007 | ||
NL | 31.01.2007 | ||
RO | 31.01.2007 | ||
SI | 31.01.2007 | ||
SK | 31.01.2007 | ||
SE | 30.04.2007 | ||
BG | 01.05.2007 | ||
GR | 01.05.2007 | ||
PT | 02.07.2007 | ||
AT | 17.07.2007 | ||
BE | 31.07.2007 | ||
CH | 31.07.2007 | ||
LI | 31.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/40] | CZ | 31.01.2007 | |
DK | 31.01.2007 | ||
FI | 31.01.2007 | ||
GB | 31.01.2007 | ||
IE | 31.01.2007 | ||
IT | 31.01.2007 | ||
NL | 31.01.2007 | ||
RO | 31.01.2007 | ||
SI | 31.01.2007 | ||
SK | 31.01.2007 | ||
SE | 30.04.2007 | ||
BG | 01.05.2007 | ||
GR | 01.05.2007 | ||
PT | 02.07.2007 | ||
BE | 31.07.2007 | ||
CH | 31.07.2007 | ||
LI | 31.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | CZ | 31.01.2007 | |
DK | 31.01.2007 | ||
FI | 31.01.2007 | ||
GB | 31.01.2007 | ||
IE | 31.01.2007 | ||
IT | 31.01.2007 | ||
NL | 31.01.2007 | ||
RO | 31.01.2007 | ||
SI | 31.01.2007 | ||
SK | 31.01.2007 | ||
SE | 30.04.2007 | ||
BG | 01.05.2007 | ||
GR | 01.05.2007 | ||
PT | 02.07.2007 | ||
CH | 31.07.2007 | ||
LI | 31.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CZ | 31.01.2007 | |
DK | 31.01.2007 | ||
FI | 31.01.2007 | ||
GB | 31.01.2007 | ||
IE | 31.01.2007 | ||
IT | 31.01.2007 | ||
NL | 31.01.2007 | ||
RO | 31.01.2007 | ||
SI | 31.01.2007 | ||
SK | 31.01.2007 | ||
SE | 30.04.2007 | ||
BG | 01.05.2007 | ||
GR | 01.05.2007 | ||
PT | 02.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | CZ | 31.01.2007 | |
DK | 31.01.2007 | ||
FI | 31.01.2007 | ||
GB | 31.01.2007 | ||
IE | 31.01.2007 | ||
NL | 31.01.2007 | ||
RO | 31.01.2007 | ||
SI | 31.01.2007 | ||
SK | 31.01.2007 | ||
SE | 30.04.2007 | ||
BG | 01.05.2007 | ||
PT | 02.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | CZ | 31.01.2007 | |
DK | 31.01.2007 | ||
FI | 31.01.2007 | ||
GB | 31.01.2007 | ||
IE | 31.01.2007 | ||
NL | 31.01.2007 | ||
SI | 31.01.2007 | ||
SK | 31.01.2007 | ||
SE | 30.04.2007 | ||
BG | 01.05.2007 | ||
PT | 02.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | DK | 31.01.2007 | |
FI | 31.01.2007 | ||
GB | 31.01.2007 | ||
IE | 31.01.2007 | ||
NL | 31.01.2007 | ||
SI | 31.01.2007 | ||
SK | 31.01.2007 | ||
SE | 30.04.2007 | ||
BG | 01.05.2007 | ||
PT | 02.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | DK | 31.01.2007 | |
FI | 31.01.2007 | ||
IE | 31.01.2007 | ||
NL | 31.01.2007 | ||
SI | 31.01.2007 | ||
SE | 30.04.2007 | ||
BG | 01.05.2007 | ||
PT | 02.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | DK | 31.01.2007 | |
FI | 31.01.2007 | ||
NL | 31.01.2007 | ||
SI | 31.01.2007 | ||
SE | 30.04.2007 | ||
BG | 01.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | FI | 31.01.2007 | |
NL | 31.01.2007 | ||
SE | 30.04.2007 | ||
BG | 01.05.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2000290542 ; | [X]US5972189 (MCMURDIE NEIL D [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9,12 * claims 1,2,7-9 *; | [X]US6124380 (BOSSERT EMILY C [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,9,12 * claims 1,8,9 *; | [X]US6156823 (SIKORA ROBERT JOHN [US]) [X] 1,2,9,12 * claims 1,3 *; | [X]US6333367 (KATO AKIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,9,12 * claim 1 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 07, Database accession no. 2001-053850, XP002276983 & JP2000290542 A 20001017 (NIPPON OILS & FATS CO LTD) [X] 1,9,12 * abstract * | Opposition | US3239411 | JPH01111641 | WO9301818 | JPH09157550 | WO9811169 | DE10001222 | - W. ZIMMERMANN, "Oligodynamische Silberwirkung", ZEITSCHRIFT FÜR HYGIENE, (1952), vol. 135, pages 403 - 413 |