Cited in | Search | Type: | Patent literature | Publication No.: | WO9411026
[Y] (IDEC PHARMA CORP [US]) [Y] 1-40,44 * the whole document *; | Type: | Patent literature | Publication No.: | US5770429
[YD] (LONBERG NILS [US], et al) [YD] 1-44 * the whole document *; | Type: | Patent literature | Publication No.: | WO0009160
[Y] (IDEC PHARMA CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-40,44 * the whole document *; | Type: | Patent literature | Publication No.: | US6120767
[Y] (ROBINSON RANDY R [US], et al) [Y] 1-40,44 * the whole document *; | Type: | Patent literature | Publication No.: | US2002009427
[XY] (WOLIN MAURICE J [US], et al) [X] 1-40,44 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0063] * * claims 1-9 * [Y] 41-43; | Type: | Patent literature | Publication No.: | WO0222212
[XY] (IDEC PHARMA CORP [US]) [X] 1-37,41-44 * the whole document * [Y] 38-40; | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | [X] - GAZZANO-SANTORO H ET AL, "A non-radioactive complement-dependent cytotoxicity assay for anti-CD20 monoclonal antibody", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V.,AMSTERDAM, NL, (19970328), vol. 202, no. 2, ISSN 0022-1759, pages 163 - 171, XP004126276 [X] 45-47 * the whole document * | DOI: | http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-1759(97)00002-1 | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | [Y] - EDWARDS J C W ET AL, "Sustained improvement in rheumatoid arthritis following a protocol designed to deplete B lymphocytes", RHEUMATOLOGY, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, LONDON, GB, (200102), vol. 40, no. 2, ISSN 1462-0324, pages 205 - 211, XP002348931 [Y] 41-43 * the whole document * | DOI: | http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/rheumatology/40.2.205 | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | [A] - VAN SPRIEL A B ET AL, "Immunotherapeutic perspective for bispecific antibodies", IMMUNOLOGY TODAY, ELSEVIER PUBLICATIONS, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (20000801), vol. 21, no. 8, ISSN 0167-5699, pages 391 - 397, XP004215167 [A] 36 * the whole document * | DOI: | http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-5699(00)01659-5 | Cited in | International search | Type: | Patent literature | Publication No.: | WO0212437
[Y] (SCHOOTEN WIM VAN [US], et al); | Type: | Patent literature | Publication No.: | US2002064823
[Y] (WELCHER ANDREW A [US], et al) | Cited in | Examination | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | - TEELING JESSICA L ET AL, "The biological activity of human CD20 monoclonal antibodies is linked to unique epitopes on CD20.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY (BALTIMORE, MD. : 1950) 1 JUL 2006, (20060701), vol. 177, no. 1, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 362 - 371 | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | - KLIMKA A ET AL, "Human anti-CD30 recombinant antibodies by guided phage antibody selection using cell panning.", BRITISH JOURNAL OF CANCER JUL 2000, (200007), vol. 83, no. 2, ISSN 0007-0920, pages 252 - 260 | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | - BARBAS S M ET AL, "Human autoantibody recognition of DNA.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA 28 MAR 1995, (19950328), vol. 92, no. 7, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 2529 - 2533 | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | - BEIBOER S H ET AL, "Guided selection of a pan carcinoma specific antibody reveals similar binding characteristics yet structural divergence between the original murine antibody and its human equivalent.", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY 25 FEB 2000, (20000225), vol. 296, no. 3, ISSN 0022-2836, pages 833 - 849 | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | - POLYMENIS M ET AL, "Critical binding site amino acids of anti-Z-DNA single chain Fv molecules. Role of heavy and light chain CDR3 and relationship to autoantibody activity.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY (BALTIMORE, MD. : 1950) 1 JUN 1994, (19940601), vol. 152, no. 11, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 5318 - 5329 | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | - DITZEL H J ET AL, "Determinants of polyreactivity in a large panel of recombinant human antibodies from HIV-1 infection.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY (BALTIMORE, MD. : 1950) 15 JUL 1996, (19960715), vol. 157, no. 2, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 739 - 749 | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | - RADER C ET AL, "A phage display approach for rapid antibody humanization: designed combinatorial V gene libraries.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA 21 JUL 1998, (19980721), vol. 95, no. 15, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 8910 - 8915 | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | - BARBAS SHANA M ET AL, "Recognition of DNA by synthetic antibodies", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1994), vol. 116, no. 5, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 2161 - 2162 | Cited in | by applicant | Type: | Patent literature | Publication No.: | US4474893
| Type: | Patent literature | Publication No.: | WO8800052
| Type: | Patent literature | Publication No.: | US4946778
| Type: | Patent literature | Publication No.: | US4954617
| Type: | Patent literature | Publication No.: | WO9410332
| Type: | Patent literature | Publication No.: | US2003017534
| Type: | Patent literature | Publication No.: | US2003118592
| Type: | Patent literature | Publication No.: | US2003133939
| Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | - GRAZIANO, R.F. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL, (1995), vol. 155, no. 10, pages 4996 - 5002 | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | - MORTON, H.C. ET AL., CRITICAL REVIEWS IN IMMUNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 16, pages 423 - 440 | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | - MONTEIRO, R.C. ET AL., J. LMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 148, page 1764 | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | - D. M. KRANZ ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1981), vol. 78, page 5807 | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | - KARPOVSKY ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1984), vol. 160, page 1686 | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | - LIU, MA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1985), vol. 82, page 8648 | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | - BEHRING, INS. MITT., (1985), no. 78, pages 118 - 132 | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | - BRENNAN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 229, pages 81 - 83 | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | - GLENNIE ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1987), vol. 139, pages 2367 - 2375 |