|
02.06.2021 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.04.2021 |
Decision to revoke the patent |
Limitation procedure |
1 |
|
26.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Limitation procedure |
1 |
|
26.03.2021 |
Authorisation |
Limitation procedure |
2 |
|
26.03.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Limitation procedure |
2 |
|
26.03.2021 |
Letter/request relating to the revocation procedure |
Limitation procedure |
2 |
|
26.03.2021 |
Request for revocation of patent |
Limitation procedure |
4 |
|
13.12.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.03.2014 |
Communication to the parties concerning termination of the opposition proceedings - opposition rejected - no appeal lodged |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2014 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2014 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.12.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2013 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.12.2013 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2013 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.12.2013 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
10.12.2013 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2013 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2013 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2013 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
25.10.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.10.2013 |
Annex |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.10.2013 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.10.2013 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2013 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2013 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2013 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.10.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
25.10.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
07.10.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.09.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.09.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
30.09.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
30.09.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.09.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.09.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
30.09.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
30.09.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
30.09.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
30.09.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.09.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.09.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
104 |
|
30.09.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
44 |
|
30.09.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
54 |
|
30.09.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
190 |
|
30.09.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
139 |
|
30.09.2013 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2013 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
20 |
|
27.08.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2013 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2013 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.06.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2013 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
17.06.2013 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.06.2013 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.06.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2013 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2013 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
22.03.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2013 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
08.03.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.03.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2012 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2012 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2012 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
12.11.2012 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2012 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2012 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
22 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
83 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
110 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
108 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
130 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
201 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
185 |
|
14.03.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2011 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.12.2011 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.2011 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2011 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2011 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.11.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2011 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
07.11.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2011 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2011 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2011 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2011 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2011 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
27.07.2011 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
27.07.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.2011 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.07.2011 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
20.07.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
20.07.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2011 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.07.2011 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
20.07.2011 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
31.03.2011 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2011 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.03.2011 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2011 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
195 |
|
18.10.2010 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.07.2010 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2009 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2009 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.01.2009 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
16.12.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
16.12.2008 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
16.12.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
16.12.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.12.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
16.12.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.12.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
16.12.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
16.12.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
16.12.2008 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
06.10.2008 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.03.2007 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.02.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
23.02.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
23.02.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
23.02.2007 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.12.2006 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2006 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2006 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2006 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2006 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.11.2006 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.10.2006 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2006 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.08.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.04.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2006 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2006 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2006 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2006 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.11.2005 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.07.2005 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
06.07.2005 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
06.07.2005 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2005 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2005 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.06.2005 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2005 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2005 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.05.2005 |
Non-scannable object |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2005 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.03.2005 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.08.2004 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.08.2004 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2004 |
Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
112 |
|
28.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
108 |
|
29.04.2004 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
201 |
|
25.03.2004 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |