14.04.2021 |
New entry: Proprietor files request for revocation |
|
03.04.2021 |
Patent revoked on request of proprietor |
published on 05.05.2021 [2021/18] |
03.04.2021 |
New entry: Decision on request for revocation |
|
03.04.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for request for revocation |
|
30.03.2021 |
New entry: Proprietor files request for revocation |
|
30.03.2021 |
New entry: Kind of request for revocation |
|
30.03.2021 |
Deletion: Payment of fee for request for revocation |
|
30.03.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for request for revocation |
|
28.03.2014 |
Opposition rejected |
published on 30.04.2014 [2014/18] |
09.12.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
09.12.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that opposition is rejected |
|
17.06.2013 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
27.03.2013 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
08.03.2013 |
Change - applicant |
published on 10.04.2013 [2013/15] |
08.03.2013 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 10.04.2013 [2013/15] |
19.11.2012 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
19.10.2012 |
Opposition filed |
published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] |
11.05.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] |
09.12.2011 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 11.01.2012 [2012/02] |
10.11.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.11.2011 |
New entry: Observations by third parties |
|
14.10.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.09.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.08.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
01.08.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
18.03.2011 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.10.2010 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] |
19.10.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.10.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.10.2010 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
08.10.2010 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
20.07.2010 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.03.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.12.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.10.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.04.2009 |
Change - applicant |
published on 06.05.2009 [2009/19] |
23.12.2008 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
17.12.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
01.10.2008 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
13.06.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] |
12.06.2008 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.02.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.10.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.03.2007 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
02.03.2007 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
01.03.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
01.03.2007 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
09.12.2006 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
08.12.2006 |
Change - inventor |
published on 10.01.2007 [2007/02] |
20.10.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.08.2006 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.04.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.12.2005 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 15.02.2006 [2006/07] |
20.10.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.07.2005 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
17.06.2005 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.08.2005 [2005/31] |
17.06.2005 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.08.2005 [2005/31] |
15.06.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.06.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.05.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.05.2005 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
26.05.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.02.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.08.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.07.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.05.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.04.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|