Designated contracting states | AT | | BE | | BG | | CH | | CY | | CZ | | DE | | DK | | EE | | ES | | FI | | FR | | GB | | GR | | HU | | IE | | IT | | LI | | LU | | MC | | NL | | PT | | RO | | SE | | SI | | SK | | TR | | Examination procedure | 07.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | | 06.05.2005 | Search fee paid | | 06.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | | 06.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | European patent granted | 11.01.2012 | Opposition procedure | 10.12.2013 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 03.08.2005 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20050506 | | Event date: | 03.08.2005 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A2 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 03.08.2005 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Countries concerned: | AL LT LV MK | | Event date: | 15.02.2006 | | Event description: | SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20060102 | | Event date: | 10.01.2007 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | TEELING, JESSICAWOODMILL COTTAGE | | Event date: | 10.01.2007 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | RUULS, SIGRID | | Event date: | 10.01.2007 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | GLENNIE, MARTIN | | Event date: | 10.01.2007 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | VAN DE WINKEL, JAN, G., J. | | Event date: | 10.01.2007 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | PARREN, PAUL | | Event date: | 10.01.2007 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | PETERSEN, JORGEN | | Event date: | 10.01.2007 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | BAADSGAARD, OLE, D., M., SC. | | Event date: | 10.01.2007 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | HUANG, HAICHUN | | Event date: | 06.05.2009 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | GENMAB A/S | | Event date: | 17.02.2006 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HK DE 1077590 HK | Code Expl.: | REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG | | Event date: | 11.01.2012 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 11.01.2012 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Countries concerned: | AL LT LV MK | | Event date: | 11.01.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | | Event date: | 13.01.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Event date: | 01.02.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | | Event date: | 08.03.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R096 60339718 DE | Code Expl.: | +DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT | Effective DATE: | 20120308 | | Event date: | 24.04.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE TRGR | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT | | Event date: | 23.04.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK T3 | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS | | Event date: | 13.04.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH NV | Code Expl.: | NEW AGENT | REPRESENTATIVE: | PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG | | Event date: | 23.04.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG PT SC4A | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE | Free Format Text: | AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION | Effective DATE: | 20120411 | | Event date: | 16.05.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FG2A 2380621 ES T3 | Code Expl.: | +DEFINITIVE PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20120516 | | Event date: | 18.04.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL T3 | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION FILED FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995 | | Event date: | 13.07.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH SPCF | Code Expl.: | SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: OFATUMUMAB; REGISTRATION NUMBER/DATE: SWISSMEDIC 60149 04.04.2011 | Filing DATE: | 20120709 | | Event date: | 11.07.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL KC1 | Code Expl.: | GRANT OF A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: HUMAAN MONOKLONAAL ANTILICHAAM DAT BINDT AAN HUMAAN CD20, DAT IN STAAT IS OM COMPLEMENTAFHANKELIJKE CYTOTOXICITEIT VAN CELLEN DIE CD20 IN AANWEZIGHEID VAN COMPLEMENT TOT EXPRESSIE BRENGEN TE INDUCEREN EN DAT LICHTKETENIGE EN ZWAARKETENIGE CDR-GEBIEDEN VOLGENS PARAGRAFEN (I), (II)(A) EN (III) VAN CONCLUSIE 1 VAN EP1558648B1(SEQ ID NR.16,17,18,13,14 EN 15) OMVAT, MET NAME EEN ANTILICHAAM DAT DE SEQUENTIES VAN DE LICHTKETENIGE EN ZWAARKETENIGE VARIABELE GEBIEDEN VOLGENS CONCLUSIES 4 VAN EP1558648B1 (SEQ ID NR.4 EN 2) OMVAT, IN HET BIJZONDER OFATUMUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/10/625/001-002 20100419 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | C300539 | Filing DATE: | 20120709 | Extension DATE: | 20250418 | | Event date: | 06.08.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SK T3 E 11771 SK | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION INTO SLOVAK | | Event date: | 08.08.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB CTFF | Code Expl.: | SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: HUMAN MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY WHICH BINDS TO HUMAN CD20 WHICH IS CAPABLE OF INDUCING COMPLEMENT DEPENDENT CYTOTOXICITY OF CELLS EXPRESSING CD20 IN THE PRESENCE OF COMPLEMENT AND WHICH COMPRISES LIGHT AND HEAVY CHAIN CDR REGIONS ACCORDING TO EP 1558648 B1 CLAI; REGISTERED: UK EU/1/10/625/001 20100419; UK EU/1/10/625/002 20100419 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | SPC/GB12/033 | Filing DATE: | 20120709 | | Event date: | 18.07.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE SPCF | Code Expl.: | REQUEST FOR GRANT OF SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 2012/026 | Filing DATE: | 20120627 | | Event date: | 14.08.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE SPCF | Code Expl.: | APPLICATION FOR SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: OFATUMUMAB; REG. NO/DATE: EU/1/10/625/001-002 20100429 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 1290024-7 | | Event date: | 13.08.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK CTFF | Code Expl.: | APPLICATION FOR SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE (SPC) FILED | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | CA 2012 00029 | Filing DATE: | 20120705 | Expiry DATE: | 20250419 | | Event date: | 11.07.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FI SPCF | Code Expl.: | SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE APPLICATION FILED | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | C20120029 | | Event date: | 15.08.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG EE FG4A E006773 EE | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF THE SPECIFICATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT VALID IN ESTONIA | Effective DATE: | 20120531 | | Event date: | 02.10.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SK SPCF | Code Expl.: | +FILING OF AN SPC | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: OFATUMUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/10/625/001 - EU/1/10/625/002 20100419 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 5015-2012 | Filing DATE: | 20120709 | | Event date: | 15.10.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG EE AA1Y E006773 EE | Code Expl.: | +SPC FILED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: ARZERRA - OFATUMUMAB;REG NO/DATE: C(2010)2578 19.04.2010 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | C20120015 | Filing DATE: | 20120704 | | Event date: | 10.08.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HK GR 1077590 HK | Code Expl.: | +STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG | | Event date: | 10.08.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR CP | Code Expl.: | SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE (SPC) FILED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: ANTICORPS MONOCLONAL HUMAIN ISOLE QUI SE LIE A CD20 HUMAIN...; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/10/625/001 20100419 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 12C0044 | Filing DATE: | 20120710 | | Event date: | 21.11.2012 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | ACTAVIS GROUP PTC EHF | Effective DATE: | 20121011 | | Event date: | 29.10.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HU AG4A E014277 HU | Code Expl.: | +FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS | | Event date: | 18.12.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE SPCG | Code Expl.: | +SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE GRANTED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: OFATUMUMAB; REG. NO/DATE: EU/1/10/625/001-002 20100419 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 1290024-7 | Expiry DATE: | 20231018 | Extension DATE: | 20250418 | | Event date: | 27.08.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG LT SPCF | Code Expl.: | FILING AN SPC | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: OFATUMUMABUM; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/10/625/001, 2010 04 19 EU/1/10/625/002 20100419 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | PA2012012 | Filing DATE: | 20120703 | Expiry DATE: | 20231017 | | Event date: | 10.04.2013 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (PATENT OWNER DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | GENMAB A/S | | Event date: | 10.01.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R026 60339718 DE | Code Expl.: | -OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT | Effective DATE: | 20121011 | | Event date: | 04.04.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG RO EPE | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT VALID IN ROMANIA | | Event date: | 15.01.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT REF 540978 AT T | Code Expl.: | +REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT VALIDATED IN AUSTRIA) | Effective DATE: | 20120115 | | Event date: | 11.01.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG LU CCP | Code Expl.: | +SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: ANTICORPS MONOCLONAL HUMAIN QUI SE LIE AU CD20 HUMAIN,QUI EST CAPABLE D INDUITE UNE CYTOTOXITE DEPENDANTE DU COMPLEMENT DES CELLULES EXPRIMANT CD2,EN PRESENCE DU COMPLEMENT ET QUI COMPREND LES REGIONS CDR DE LA CHAINE LEGERE ET DE LA CHAINE LOURDE SELON EP1558648B1 REVENDICATION 1,PARAGRAPHES I,II A ET III SEQ ID NOS 16,17,18,13,14 ET 15 EN PARTICULIER UN ANTICORPS COMPRENANT LES SEQUENCES DE LA REGION VARIABLE DE LA CHAINE LEGERE ET DE LA CHAINE LOURDE SELON EP1558648B1 REVENDICATION 4 SEQ ID NOS 4 ET 2,EN PARTICULIER OFATUMUMAB | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 92041 | Filing DATE: | 20120711 | Expiry DATE: | 20250119 | | Event date: | 30.04.2014 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION REJECTED | Effective DATE: | 20131030 | | Event date: | 05.06.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R100 60339718 DE | Code Expl.: | +EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT UNAMENDED NOW FINAL | Effective DATE: | 20131030 | | Event date: | 27.09.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R065 | Code Expl.: | +REQUEST FOR GRANT OF SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE VALIDLY FILED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: HUMANER MONOKLONALER ANTIKOERPER, DER AN HUMANES CD20 BINDET, DER FAEHIG IST, KOMPLEMENT-ABHAENGIGE CYTOTOXIZITAET VON ZELLEN, DIE CD20 EXPRIMIEREN, IN GEGENWART VON KOMPLEMENT ZU INDUZIEREN, UND DER CDR-REGIONEN DER LEICHTEN UND SCHWEREN KETTE GEMAESS EP 1 558 648 B1, ANSPRUCH 1, ABSAETZE (I), (II)(A) UND (III) UMFASST (SEQ ID NOS: 16,17,18,13,14 UND15), SPEZIELL EIN ANTIKOERPER, DER DIE SEQUENZEN DER VA; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/10/625/001-002 20100419 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 122012000048 | Filing DATE: | 20120706 | Expiry DATE: | 20231018 | Effective DATE: | 20120808 | | Event date: | 26.01.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG LT SPCG | Code Expl.: | +GRANT OF AN SPC | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: OFATUMUMABUM; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/10/625/001, 2010 04 19 EU/1/10/625/002 20100419 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | PA2012012,C1558648 | Filing DATE: | 20120703 | Expiry DATE: | 20231017 | Extension DATE: | 20250419 | | Event date: | 31.03.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH SPCG | Code Expl.: | +SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE GRANTED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: OFATUMUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: SWISSMEDIC 60149 04.04.2011 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | C01558648/01 | Filing DATE: | 20120709 | Extension DATE: | 20260403 | | Event date: | 28.08.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HU AA1S | Code Expl.: | +INFORMATION ON APPLICATION FOR A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: OFATUMUMAB (HUMAN CD20-BINDING MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY, WHICH IS CAPABLE TO INDUCE THE COMPLEMENT-DEPENDENT CITOTOXICITY OS THE CD20-EXPRESSING CELLS, AND COMPRISES THE CDR REGIONS OF THE 1. CLAIM OF THE EP1558648B1 PATENT); REG. NO/DATE: EU/1/10/625/001-002 20100419 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | S1200013 | Filing DATE: | 20120711 | | Event date: | 15.05.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG EE FG1Y E006773 EE | Code Expl.: | +SPC GRANTED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: ARZERRA - OFATUMUMAB;REG NO/DATE: K(2010)2578 21.04.2010 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | C20120015 00129 | Filing DATE: | 20120704 | Extension DATE: | 20250421 | | Event date: | 18.06.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GR EP 20120400734 GR | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE | Effective DATE: | 20120518 | | Event date: | 26.01.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG LT SPCG | Code Expl.: | +GRANT OF AN SPC | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: OFATUMUMABUM; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/10/625/001, 2010-04-19 EU/1/10/625/002 20100419 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | PA2012012,C1558648 | Filing DATE: | 20120703 | Expiry DATE: | 20231017 | Extension DATE: | 20250421 | | Event date: | 10.07.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR CP | Code Expl.: | SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE (SPC) FILED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: OFATUMUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/10/625/001 20100421 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 12C0044 | Filing DATE: | 20120710 | | Event date: | 19.09.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 30.09.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR CT | Code Expl.: | +GRANTED SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE (SPC) FOR MEDICINE (EEC REGULATION OF 18 JUNE 1992) | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: OFATUMUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/10/625/001 20100421 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 12C0044 | Filing DATE: | 20120710 | Extension DATE: | 20250421 | | Event date: | 28.10.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR AV | Code Expl.: | OTHER ACTION AFFECTING THE EXISTENCE OR THE VALIDITY OF AN INDUSTRIAL PROPERTY RIGHT | Effective DATE: | 20160927 | | Event date: | 31.10.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK CTFG | Code Expl.: | +SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE (SPC) ISSUED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: OFATUMUMAB; REG. NO/DATE: EU/1/10/625/001-002 20100421 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | CR 2012 00029 | Filing DATE: | 20120705 | Expiry DATE: | 20231017 | Extension DATE: | 20250421 | | Event date: | 31.05.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE SPCG | Code Expl.: | +SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE GRANTED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: OFATUMUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/10/625/001-002 20120419 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 2012/026 | Extension DATE: | 20250420 | Effective DATE: | 20170508 | | Event date: | 28.06.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL SPCG | Code Expl.: | +GRANT OF A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: OFATUMUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/10/625/001-002 20100421 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 300539 | Filing DATE: | 20120709 | Expiry DATE: | 20231016 | Extension DATE: | 20250420 | Effective DATE: | 20170622 | | Event date: | 18.09.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 23.05.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FI SPCG | Code Expl.: | +SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE GRANTED | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 526 | Extension DATE: | 20250421 | | Event date: | 22.05.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG LU HC | Code Expl.: | CHANGE/CORRECTION OF NAME AND/OR ADDRESS OF THE OWNERS | OWNER: | GENMAB A/S; DK | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: GENMAB A/S | Effective DATE: | 20180418 | | Event date: | 13.09.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 16 | | Event date: | 22.08.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG BE SPCF | Code Expl.: | SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: ANTICORPS MONOCLONAL HUMAIN QUI SE LIE A CD20 HUMAIN QUI EST CAPABLE D'INDUIRE LA CYTOTOXICITE DEPENDANTE DU COMPLEMENT DES CELLULES EXPRIMANT LE CD20 EN PRESENCE DU COMPLEMENT ET QUI COMPREND DES REGIONS CDR DE CHAINEE LEGERE ET LOURDE TEL QUE MENTIONNE D; AUTHORISATION NUMBER AND DATE: EU/1/10/625/001 20100421 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 2012C/029 | Filing DATE: | 20120704 | Expiry DATE: | 20231017 | Extension DATE: | 20250421 | | Event date: | 15.03.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT SPCG 540978 AT T | Code Expl.: | +GRANT OF AN SPC | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: OFATUMUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/10/625/001-002 (MITTEILUNG) 20100421 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 30/2012 | Filing DATE: | 20120710 | Expiry DATE: | 20231017 | Extension DATE: | 20250421 | Effective DATE: | 20190315 | | Event date: | 03.04.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG RO SPCG | Code Expl.: | +SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE GRANTED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: OFATUMUMAB; NATIONAL AUTHORISATION NUMBER: RO EU/1/10/625/001-002; DATE OF NATIONAL AUTHORISATION: 20100419; NUMBER OF FIRST AUTHORISATION IN EUROPEAN ECONOMIC AREA (EEA): EMEA EU/1/10/625/001-002; DATE OF FIRST AUTHORISATION IN EEA: 20100419 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | C 2012 022 | Extension DATE: | 20250421 | Effective DATE: | 20190329 | | Event date: | 30.08.2019 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SI | Payment DATE: | 20170927 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 30.07.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IT SPCG 502012902039460 IT | Code Expl.: | +SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE (SPC) GRANTED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: OFATUMUMAB(ARZERRA); AUTHORISATION NUMBER(S) AND DATE(S): EU/1/10/625/001-002, 20100419 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 132012902067487 | Extension DATE: | 20250418 | | Event date: | 10.07.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IT SPCF 502012902039460 IT | Code Expl.: | +SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE (SPC) FILED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: OFATUMUMAB(ARZERRA); AUTHORISATION NUMBER(S) AND DATE(S): EU/1/10/625/001-002, 20100419 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 132012902067487 | | Event date: | 04.05.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SK SPCG | Code Expl.: | +GRANT OF AN SPC | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: OFATUMUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/10/625/001 - EU/1/10/625/002 20100421 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 337 5015-2012 | Filing DATE: | 20120709 | Extension DATE: | 20250421 | | Event date: | 30.10.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SK | Payment DATE: | 20200922 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 30.10.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | EE | Payment DATE: | 20200928 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 30.10.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20200914 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 30.11.2020 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20181017 | | Event date: | 30.11.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Payment DATE: | 20200916 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 31.12.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Payment DATE: | 20201012 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 31.12.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 20201015 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 29.01.2021 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CY | Payment DATE: | 20201012 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 29.01.2021 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CZ | Payment DATE: | 20200930 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 29.01.2021 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Payment DATE: | 20201012 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 29.01.2021 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Payment DATE: | 20201009 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 29.01.2021 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Payment DATE: | 20201009 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 29.01.2021 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Payment DATE: | 20200925 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 29.01.2021 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | RO | Payment DATE: | 20201005 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 29.01.2021 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | HU | Payment DATE: | 20200915 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 29.01.2021 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Payment DATE: | 20201105 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 29.01.2021 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Payment DATE: | 20201015 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 29.01.2021 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Payment DATE: | 20201012 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 01.08.2011 | | Event description: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Event date: | 18.03.2011 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Event date: | 09.12.2011 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 08.11.2011 | | Event description: | OBSERVATIONS FILED BY THIRD PARTIES | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNTIPA | | Event date: | 15.04.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PL | Code Expl.: | -PATENT CEASED | | Event date: | 03.04.2021 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: PATENT REVOKED BY PROPRIETOR | | Event date: | 30.03.2021 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: OPPOSITION REJECTED | | Event date: | 28.04.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB CTFW | Code Expl.: | -APPLICATION TO WITHDRAW OR OFFER TO SURRENDER A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: HUMAN MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY WHICH BINDS TO HUMAN CD20 WHICH IS CAPABLE OF INDUCING COMPLEMENT DEPENDENT CYTOTOXICITY OF CELLS EXPRESSING CD20 IN THE PRESENCE OF COMPLEMENT AND WHICH COMPRISES LIGHT AND HEAVY CHAIN CDR REGIONS ACCORDING TO EP1558648 B1 CLAIM; REGISTERED: UK EU/1/10/625/001 20100419; UK EU/1/10/625/002 20100419 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | SPC/GB12/033 | Filing DATE: | 20120709 | | Event date: | 05.05.2021 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR REVOCATION FILED AFTER OPPOSITION PERIOD FOUND ADMISSIBLE | Filing DATE: | 20210326 | Effective DATE: | 20210505 | | Event date: | 17.05.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG EE MF4A E006773 EE | Code Expl.: | -RIGHT REVOKED FOLLOWING OPPOSITION OR REVOCATION | Effective DATE: | 20210505 | | Event date: | 17.05.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG EE MC1Y E006773 EE | Code Expl.: | -ANNULMENT OF AN SPC | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: PRADAXA - DABIGATRAANETEKSILAAT (MESUELAADINA); NATIONAL AUTHORISATION NUMBER: EMA/607941/2020 12.11.2020 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 00129 | Extension DATE: | 20230920 | | Event date: | 26.05.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SK MC4A E 11771 SK | Code Expl.: | -ANNULMENT OF PATENT | Effective DATE: | 20210505 | | Event date: | 17.06.2005 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 28.03.2014 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: OPPOSITION REJECTED | | Event date: | 23.06.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE SPCI | Code Expl.: | -SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE DECLARED INVALID | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: OFATUMUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/10/625/001-002 20120419 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 2012/026 | | Event date: | 09.06.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SK SPCI | Code Expl.: | -DECLARATION OF INVALIDITY OF AN SPC BY REASON OF REVOCATION OR LIMITATION OF BASIC PATENT | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 337 | | Event date: | 26.07.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG LT SPCW | Code Expl.: | -WITHDRAWAL OF AN SPC | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: OFATUMUMABUM; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/10/625/001, 2010-04-19 EU/1/10/625/002 20100419 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | PA2012012,C1558648 | Filing DATE: | 20120703 | Expiry DATE: | 20231017 | Extension DATE: | 20210726 | Effective DATE: | 20210726 | | Event date: | 30.07.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH SPCL | Code Expl.: | -SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE DELETION | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | C01558648/01 | | Event date: | 26.07.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG LT MA9A | Code Expl.: | -PATENT REVOKED | Effective DATE: | 20210505 | | Event date: | 31.08.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE SPCC | Code Expl.: | -SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE IS INVALID AS THE BASIC PATENT HAS CEASED BEFORE THE 20-YEAR PROTECTION PERIOD | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: OFATUMUMAB | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 1290024-7 | | Event date: | 15.10.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT MA03 540978 AT T | Code Expl.: | -REVOCATION OF THE PATENT | Effective DATE: | 20210505 | | Event date: | 29.10.2021 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BG | Payment DATE: | 20210920 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 29.10.2021 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20210910 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 30.11.2021 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20210907 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 30.11.2021 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Payment DATE: | 20210914 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 05.05.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R064 60339718 DE | Code Expl.: | -EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL | | Event date: | 26.03.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R061 60339718 DE | Code Expl.: | -REVOCATION REQUEST RECEIVED BY EPO | | Event date: | 05.05.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R103 60339718 DE | Code Expl.: | -PATENT REVOKED BY EPO | | Event date: | 31.01.2022 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20210908 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 14.04.2021 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR REVOCATION FILED BY PATENT HOLDER | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNRVR6 | | Event date: | 03.04.2021 | | Event description: | PATENT REVOKED ON REQUEST OF PROPRIETOR | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009220 | | Event date: | 03.04.2021 | | Event description: | DECISION ON REQUEST FOR REVOCATION | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNRVR3 | | Event date: | 30.03.2021 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR REVOCATION FILED BY PATENT HOLDER | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNRVR1 | | Event date: | 30.03.2021 | | Event description: | KIND OF REQUEST FOR REVOCATION RECORDED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNRVR2 | | Event date: | 28.03.2014 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION REJECTED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009273 | | Event date: | 09.12.2013 | | Event description: | COMMUNICATION DESPATCHED THAT OPPOSITION WAS REJECTED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNREJ1 | | Event date: | 27.03.2013 | | Event description: | REPLY OF PATENT PROPRIETOR TO NOTICE(S) OF OPPOSITION RECEIVED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS3 | | Event date: | 19.11.2012 | | Event description: | NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND REQUEST TO FILE OBSERVATION + TIME LIMIT SENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS2 | | Event date: | 19.10.2012 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009260 | | Event date: | 14.04.2021 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: PATENT REVOKED BY PROPRIETOR | | Event date: | 15.02.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT SPCN 540978 AT T | Code Expl.: | -NULLIFICATION OF AN SPC | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: OFATUMUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/10/625/001-002 (MITTEILUNG) 20100421 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 30/2012 | Filing DATE: | 20120710 | Expiry DATE: | 20231017 | Extension DATE: | 20250421 | Effective DATE: | 20231017 | | Event date: | 16.08.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GR NF 20120400734 GR | Code Expl.: | +RESTORATION OF LAPSED RIGHT | Effective DATE: | 20220808 | | Event date: | 30.11.2022 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Payment DATE: | 20220930 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 31.01.2023 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Payment DATE: | 20221016 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 31.01.2023 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | TR | Payment DATE: | 20221013 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 28.06.2023 | | Event description: | GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20221017 | |