EP1590607 - HEATING PLANT CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2017 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states I.V.A.R. S.P.A. Via IV Novembre, 181 25080 Prevalle / IT | [2005/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERTOLOTTI, Umberto Via Zanardelli, 22 I-25080 Prevalle (Brescia) / IT | [2005/44] | Representative(s) | Galassi, Alessandro, et al PGA S.p.A. Milano Via Mascheroni, 31 20145 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2016/37] | Galassi, Alessandro, et al PGA S.r.l. Via Mascheroni, 31 20145 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2011/14] | Galassi, Alessandro, et al Ponzellini Gioia E Associati S.R.L. Via Mascheroni, 31 20145 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2009/44] | Tirloni, Bartolomeo, et al Bugnion S.p.A. Via Dante, 17 25122 Brescia / IT | ||
Former [2005/44] | Galassi, Alessandro Bugnion S.p.A. Via Dante, 17 25122 Brescia / IT | Application number, filing date | 03815723.6 | 04.02.2003 | [2005/44] | WO2003IT00054 | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004070280 | Date: | 19.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1590607 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1590607 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F24D3/10, F24D19/10 | [2005/44] | CPC: |
F24D3/1066 (EP);
F24D19/1015 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/37] |
Former [2005/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 01.07.2005 | LV | 01.07.2005 | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG ZUR REGELUNG EINER HEIZUNGSANLAGE | [2016/20] | English: | HEATING PLANT CONTROL DEVICE | [2005/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RÉGULATION POUR INSTALLATION DE CHAUFFAGE | [2016/22] |
Former [2005/44] | STEUERVORRICHTUNG FÜR HEIZANLAGE | ||
Former [2005/44] | DISPOSITIF DE REGULATION POUR INSTALLATION DE CHAUFFAGE | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2004 | Translation filed | 01.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/44] | 22.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.08.2006 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.09.2016 | DK | 14.09.2016 | MC | 14.09.2016 | BG | 14.12.2016 | IE | 04.02.2017 | LU | 04.02.2017 | [2019/46] |
Former [2019/19] | DK | 14.09.2016 | |
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
IE | 04.02.2017 | ||
LU | 04.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/04] | DK | 14.09.2016 | |
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
LU | 04.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/47] | DK | 14.09.2016 | |
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | DK | 14.09.2016 | |
BG | 14.12.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR1539732 (WEISHAUPT MAX GMBH) [A] 1,5 * figure - *; | [X]FR2740863 (AXTERM [FR]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]DE29820945U (SCHOETTLER FRANK [DE]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1033539 (CASTELLETTI LUIGI [IT]) [A] 1,5* abstract * | by applicant | FR2740863 | DE29820945U | EP1033539 |