Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
14.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] |
06.10.2006 | (Expected) grant | published on 08.11.2006 [2006/45] |
22.09.2006 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
22.09.2006 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
04.08.2006 | Definitive list of designations | published on 06.09.2006 [2006/36] |
16.05.2006 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
03.03.2006 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
03.02.2006 | Request for examination filed | published on 22.03.2006 [2006/12] |
11.11.2005 | Publication of search report | published on 28.12.2005 [2005/52] |
18.06.2004 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 04.08.2004 [2004/32] |