Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6895769 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2005 | B2 | US2004237549 | 02.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003026035 | 03.02.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4143434B | Global Dossier | 03.09.2008 | B2 | JP2004237765 | 26.08.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003026035 | 03.02.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1442906 | Global Dossier | 08.11.2006 | B1 | EP1442906 | 28.12.2005 | A3 | EP1442906 | 04.08.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2003026035 | 03.02.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602004003072T | 08.03.2007 | T2 | DE602004003072D1 | 21.12.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003026035 | 03.02.2003 |