EP1442906 - Air conditioning apparatus using supercritical refrigerant for vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Calsonic Kansei Corporation 5-24-15, Minamidai, Nakano-ku Tokyo 164-8602 / JP | [2006/45] |
Former [2004/32] | For all designated states Calsonic Kansei Corporation 5-24-15, Minamidai, Nakano-ku Tokyo 164-8602 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okawara, Yasuhito c/o Calsonic Kansei Corporation 5-24-15, Minamidai Nakano-ku Tokyo 164-8602 / JP | 02 /
Yajima, Toshio c/o Calsonic Kansei Corporation 5-24-15, Minamidai Nakano-ku Tokyo 164-8602 / JP | [2004/32] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/32] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04002226.1 | 02.02.2004 | [2004/32] | Priority number, date | JP20030026035 | 03.02.2003 Original published format: JP 2003026035 | [2004/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1442906 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1442906 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | [2005/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1442906 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/32 | [2004/32] | CPC: |
F25B9/008 (EP,US);
B60H1/3208 (EP,US);
F25B49/022 (EP,US);
B60H2001/3241 (EP,US);
B60H2001/3255 (EP,US);
B60H2001/3266 (EP,US);
B60H2001/3275 (EP,US);
B60H2001/3285 (EP,US);
F25B2309/061 (EP,US);
F25B2341/063 (EP,US);
F25B2600/02 (EP,US);
F25B2600/17 (EP,US);
F25B2600/2505 (EP,US);
F25B2700/19 (EP,US);
F25B2700/2102 (EP,US);
F25B2700/21172 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/36] |
Former [2004/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Klimaanlage mit überkritischem Kältemittel für Fahrzeugkarosserien | [2004/32] | English: | Air conditioning apparatus using supercritical refrigerant for vehicle | [2004/32] | French: | Appareil de climatisation avec un réfrigérant supercritique pour véhicules | [2004/32] | Examination procedure | 20.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/12] | 18.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0952412 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS [JP], et al) [A] 1; | [A]EP0952344 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS [JP])[A] 1; | [A]DE19947886 (SANDEN CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 33 - line 43 * * column 8, line 13 - line 18 * * figure - *; | [A]US2002100285 (BARUSCHKE WILHELM [DE], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0035] * * abstract * | by applicant | JPH02931668 |