EP1525818 - Stick-type glue dispenser with quick-opening cap [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Morris Corporation 952, Dohwa-dong, Nam-gu Inchon-shi, 402-060 / KR | [2006/41] |
Former [2005/17] | For all designated states Morris Corporation 952, Dohwa-dong, Nam-gu Inchon-shi, 402-060 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoon, Hyun-son 106-1701 Ssangyong Apartment Imun3-dong Dongdaemun-gu Seoul 130-083 / KR | [2005/17] | Representative(s) | Schöniger, Franz-Josef Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 02 51 80076 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/46] | Schöniger, Franz-Josef Betten & Resch Patentanwälte Postfach 10 02 51 80076 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/17] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner GbR Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04006974.2 | 23.03.2004 | [2005/17] | Priority number, date | KR20030032901 | 21.10.2003 Original published format: KR 2003032901 | [2005/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1525818 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1525818 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A45D34/00, A45D40/00, B43K23/08 | [2005/17] | CPC: |
B43M11/06 (EP,US);
B43M11/00 (KR);
A45D40/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/17] | Title | German: | Klebstoffstift mit schnell öffnender Kappe | [2005/17] | English: | Stick-type glue dispenser with quick-opening cap | [2005/17] | French: | Baton à colle comportant un capuchon à ouverture rapide | [2005/17] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/39] | 27.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.10.2006 | BE | 11.10.2006 | CH | 11.10.2006 | CY | 11.10.2006 | CZ | 11.10.2006 | EE | 11.10.2006 | FI | 11.10.2006 | IT | 11.10.2006 | LI | 11.10.2006 | NL | 11.10.2006 | PL | 11.10.2006 | RO | 11.10.2006 | SI | 11.10.2006 | SK | 11.10.2006 | TR | 11.10.2006 | BG | 11.01.2007 | DK | 11.01.2007 | SE | 11.01.2007 | GR | 12.01.2007 | PT | 19.03.2007 | IE | 23.03.2007 | LU | 23.03.2007 | MC | 31.03.2007 | HU | 12.04.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/40] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
BE | 11.10.2006 | ||
CH | 11.10.2006 | ||
CY | 11.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2006 | ||
EE | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
LI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
PL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
GR | 12.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
IE | 23.03.2007 | ||
LU | 23.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
BE | 11.10.2006 | ||
CH | 11.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2006 | ||
EE | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
LI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
PL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
GR | 12.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
IE | 23.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
BE | 11.10.2006 | ||
CH | 11.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
LI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
PL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
GR | 12.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
IE | 23.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
BE | 11.10.2006 | ||
CH | 11.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
LI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
PL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
IE | 23.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
BE | 11.10.2006 | ||
CH | 11.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
LI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
PL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
BE | 11.10.2006 | ||
CH | 11.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
LI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
PL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/42] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
BE | 11.10.2006 | ||
CH | 11.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
LI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
PL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
BE | 11.10.2006 | ||
CH | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
LI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
PL | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
PL | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/20] | NL | 11.10.2006 | |
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/15] | SI | 11.10.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1379057 (SPELLING THOMAS C)[A] 1-22; | [A]US5263787 (WILCOX REED N [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * figures 7,8 *; | [A]EP1083130 (KARISU INTERNAT YUGEN KAISHA [JP]) [A] 1-22 * abstract *; | [A]US6332729 (KORESKA PETER [AT]) [A] 1-22 * abstract *; | [A]US6409403 (WOOS MICHAEL T [US]) [A] 1-22 * abstract * |