|
07.01.2011 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.12.2010 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.12.2010 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
23 |
|
08.11.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
05.11.2010 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
26.10.2010 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.2010 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
6 |
|
11.08.2010 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.2010 |
General enquiry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2009 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.2007 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.2007 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.11.2007 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.2007 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.10.2007 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.10.2007 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
21.08.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2007 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2007 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.06.2007 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
22.06.2007 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2007 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.05.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.05.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.05.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.05.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.05.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.05.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.05.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.05.2007 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.05.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.05.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.05.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.05.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.05.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.05.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.05.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.05.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.05.2007 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
21.05.2007 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.05.2007 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
11.05.2007 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2007 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2007 |
Final instructions (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2007 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.03.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2007 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.01.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.01.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.01.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.01.2007 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2006 |
Communication concerning non paid of designation fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
11.09.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2006 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2006 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.02.2006 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2006 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.09.2005 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2005 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
13.10.2004 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2004 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2004 |
Fax filed during the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2004 |
Invitation to confirm the patent application filed by fax |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2004 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2004 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |