EP1480194 - Energy recovery circuit and driving method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.01.2011 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 16.02.2011 [2011/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yeoeuido-dong, Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/48] | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yeoeuido-dong, Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 151-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kwak, Jong Woon Namhyeon-dong 1082-30ho 1FI Gwanak-gu Seoul / KR | 02 /
Choi, Jeong Pil LG Village Apt.305-804 Geumgok-dong 530(73/2) Gwonseon-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2004/48] | Representative(s) | Trinks, Ole, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/47] | Trinks, Ole, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR P.O. Box 102605 86016 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [2009/29] | Vetter, Ewald Otto, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [2004/48] | Vetter, Ewald Otto, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät GbR (Depotstrasse 5 1/2, 86199 Augsburg), Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04012105.5 | 21.05.2004 | [2004/48] | Priority number, date | KR20030032474 | 22.05.2003 Original published format: KR 2003032474 | [2004/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1480194 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1480194 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | [2006/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/288 | [2004/48] | CPC: |
G09G3/2965 (EP,US);
G09G3/296 (KR);
G09G3/298 (EP,US);
G09G2310/066 (EP,US);
G09G2330/024 (EP,US);
G09G3/294 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2006/48] |
Former [2004/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System zur Energierückgewinnung und Ansteuerverfahren dafür | [2004/48] | English: | Energy recovery circuit and driving method thereof | [2004/48] | French: | Système de récupération d'énergie et procédé de commande correspondant | [2004/48] | Examination procedure | 15.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 11.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 20.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/07] | 22.06.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.09.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.12.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/07] | Appeal following examination | 21.08.2007 | Appeal received No. T1841/07 | 22.10.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 07.12.2010 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 07.12.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.12.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.11.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0261584 (UNIV ILLINOIS [US]) [X] 1-7,9-12 * page 8, lines 34-42; figures 5,6,8,9 * * page 9, line 51 - page 10, line 48 * [Y] 8; | [Y]EP1160756 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 8* paragraphs [0125] - [0129]; figure 9 *; | [X]EP1267320 (PIONEER CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-7,9-12 * paragraphs [0015] , [0044] , [0045] , [0049] - [0052] - [0062] - [0077]; figures 2,4-6 * | Examination | US5861737 |