EP1602349 - Reciprocating massaging structure with means for indicating failure of reversion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2007 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Liang, Ching-Yao No. 53, Chung Hsing St. Hsin Shih Hsiang Tainan Hsuan / TW | [2005/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/49] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/49] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04013036.1 | 02.06.2004 | [2005/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1602349 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61H1/00, A61H37/00 | [2005/49] | CPC: |
A61H15/0078 (EP);
A61H7/007 (EP);
A61H2015/0028 (EP);
A61H2201/0138 (EP);
A61H2201/0142 (EP);
A61H2201/0149 (EP);
A61H2201/1623 (EP);
A61H2201/1654 (EP);
A61H2201/1669 (EP);
A61H2205/081 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/49] | Title | German: | Hin- und herbewegender Massagemechanismus mit Mitteln zum Anzeigen fehlerhafter Richtungswechsel | [2005/49] | English: | Reciprocating massaging structure with means for indicating failure of reversion | [2005/49] | French: | Dispositif de massage en mouvement va-et-viens avec moyens d'indication de manque de changement de direction | [2005/49] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/29] | 15.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/49] | 13.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4615336 (FIJIMOTO SHINICHIRO [JP]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 52 - line 58; figure 5 *; | [A]US5462516 (ANDERSON LOUIS R [US]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [DA]US6224563 (NONOUE TORAHIKO [JP], et al) [DA] 1 * column 4, line 14 - line 46; figure 2 * |