Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8144174 | Global Dossier | 27.03.2012 | B2 | US2011074815 | 31.03.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004167726 | 04.06.2004 | US41648109 | 01.04.2009 | US96270610 | 08.12.2010 | US89130004 | 15.07.2004 | US48793803 | 18.07.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7876337 | Global Dossier | 25.01.2011 | B2 | US2009184963 | 23.07.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004167726 | 04.06.2004 | US41648109 | 01.04.2009 | US89130004 | 15.07.2004 | US48793803 | 18.07.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7551190 | Global Dossier | 23.06.2009 | B2 | US2005012761 | 20.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004167726 | 04.06.2004 | US89130004 | 15.07.2004 | US48793803 | 18.07.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2005039794 | Global Dossier | 10.02.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US48793803 | 18.07.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101383896 | 11.03.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US48793803 | 18.07.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101076552B | Global Dossier | 24.10.2011 | B1 | KR20050009954 | 26.01.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004167726 | 04.06.2004 | US48793803 | 18.07.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101051525B | Global Dossier | 22.07.2011 | B1 | KR20110057090 | 31.05.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004167726 | 04.06.2004 | US48793803 | 18.07.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101026567B | Global Dossier | 31.03.2011 | B1 | KR20090082328 | 30.07.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004167726 | 04.06.2004 | US48793803 | 18.07.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1499124 | Global Dossier | 04.05.2005 | A3 | EP1499124 | 19.01.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2004167726 | 04.06.2004 | US48793803 | 18.07.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100438591C | 26.11.2008 | C | CN1578434 | 09.02.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004167726 | 04.06.2004 | US48793803 | 18.07.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101370077B | 25.01.2012 | B | CN101370077 | 18.02.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004167726 | 04.06.2004 | US48793803 | 18.07.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101383895B | 20.07.2011 | B | CN101383895 | 11.03.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004167726 | 04.06.2004 | US48793803 | 18.07.2003 |