EP1499124 - Display processing method and display processing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2011 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.08.2011 [2011/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2005/03] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shiomi, Takakazu 30-5, Tohda-cho Hirakata-shi Osaka 573-0045 / JP | 02 /
Watanabe, Shigeaki 601, Bradley Court Mount Laurel NJ 08054 / US | 03 /
Terao, Satoshi 2-22-20, Sawaragihama Ibaraki-shi Osaka, 567-0864 / JP | [2005/03] | Representative(s) | Holmes, Miles Keeton, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Holmes, Miles Keeton, et al Novagraaf International S.A. 25, avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets Geneva / CH | ||
Former [2005/03] | Holmes, Miles, et al Novagraaf International SA, 25, avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 04016642.3 | 15.07.2004 | [2005/03] | Priority number, date | US20030487938P | 18.07.2003 Original published format: US 487938 P | JP20040167726 | 04.06.2004 Original published format: JP 2004167726 | [2005/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1499124 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1499124 | Date: | 04.05.2005 | [2005/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/01, H04N5/445, H04N5/44 | [2005/18] | CPC: |
H04N21/4312 (EP);
H04N7/01 (EP,KR);
H04N21/4314 (EP);
H04N21/440263 (EP);
H04N21/443 (EP);
H04N21/8153 (EP);
H04N5/44504 (EP);
H04N21/426 (EP);
H04N21/47 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2005/03] | H04N7/01 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/03] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Anzeigeverarbeitung | [2005/03] | English: | Display processing method and display processing apparatus | [2005/03] | French: | Méthode et dispositif de traitement d'affichage | [2005/03] | Examination procedure | 14.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 09.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/31] | 10.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.05.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US6493036 (FERNANDEZ GUSTAVO A [US]) [Y] 1,6 * abstract * * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 50; figures 3,4 * * column 5, line 30 - column 7, line 36; figures 7-9 * [A] 5,10,11,15,16,20; | [A]US6573905 (MACINNIS ALEXANDER G [US], et al) [A] 1,6,11,16 * column 2, line 17 - line 31 * * column 62, line 51 - column 64, line 46; figure 39 * * column 67, line 21 - column 68, line 14; figure 40 ** column 96, line 38 - line 63; figure 61 *; | [YA]EP1328114 (CANAL & TECHNOLOGIES SA [FR]) [Y] 1,6 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0172] - paragraph [0180]; figures 12-15 * [A] 11,16 |