Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
15.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.01.2007 [2007/03] |
30.08.2006 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
18.08.2006 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
02.06.2006 | Definitive list of designations | published on 05.07.2006 [2006/27] |
01.06.2006 | New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit | |
01.06.2006 | New entry: Period of grace R.85b EPC 1973: despatch of communication + time limit | |
09.09.2005 | Publication of search report | published on 26.10.2005 [2005/43] |
09.09.2005 | Change - classification | published on 26.10.2005 [2005/43] |
14.01.2005 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 02.03.2005 [2005/09] |