|
15.02.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2015 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2014 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2014 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.10.2014 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
30.09.2014 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.09.2014 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.09.2014 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.09.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2014 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.09.2014 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2014 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2014 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2014 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.09.2014 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.05.2014 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.05.2014 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.05.2014 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2014 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
23.04.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.04.2014 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2014 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
14.04.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2014 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2014 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.2013 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.08.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.08.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.08.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.08.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.08.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.08.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.08.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.08.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.08.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
09.01.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.10.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2011 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.05.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.05.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.05.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.05.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.03.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.03.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.01.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.01.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.01.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.02.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.02.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.11.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.11.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2007 |
Notice on debiting of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2007 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2007 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.01.2007 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2007 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.03.2006 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2005 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2004 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.2004 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2004 |
Non-scannable object |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2004 |
US-Priority document (transmitted on CD) |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
21.09.2004 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.09.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
21.09.2004 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2004 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.09.2004 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |