13.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
25.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
13.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] |
06.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] |
19.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] |
06.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] |
09.10.2015 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 11.11.2015 [2015/46] |
07.08.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2015 [2015/37] |
31.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] |
24.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] |
22.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2015 [2015/26] |
15.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] |
08.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] |
01.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] |
07.11.2014 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] |
29.10.2014 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
13.10.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.10.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
03.10.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
10.09.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.05.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.04.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
13.09.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.12.2012 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
01.10.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.12.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
12.10.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.09.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.09.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.05.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
23.03.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.09.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.01.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
07.01.2009 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.09.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.08.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.03.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
09.11.2007 |
First examination report |
|
03.11.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.09.2007 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 24.10.2007 [2007/43] |
14.09.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.04.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.05.2007 [2007/19] |
19.01.2007 |
Publication of search report |
published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] |
19.01.2007 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] |
19.09.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.02.2005 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 30.03.2005 [2005/13] |