EP1519101 - Purgeable container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC. 7201 Hamilton Boulevard Allentown, PA 18195-1501 / US | [2005/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steidl, Thomas Andrew 2928 Anaheim St. Escondido, CA 92025 / US | 02 /
Vivanco, Gildardo 3828 Mission Boulevard San Diego, CA 92109 / US | 03 /
Birtcher, Charles Michael 30653 Rolling Hills Drive Valley Center, CA 92082 / US | [2005/13] | Representative(s) | Marx, Lothar Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Postfach 86 02 45 81629 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/49] | Marx, Lothar Patentanwälte Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/13] | Marx, Lothar, Dr. Patentanwälte Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04022387.7 | 21.09.2004 | [2005/13] | Priority number, date | US20030669942 | 24.09.2003 Original published format: US 669942 | [2005/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1519101 | Date: | 30.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1519101 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | [2007/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1519101 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F17C13/04, C23C16/44, B08B9/00 | [2007/08] | CPC: |
F17C13/04 (EP,US);
H01L21/02 (KR);
B01J4/00 (KR);
B08B9/00 (EP,US);
C23C16/4402 (EP,US);
F17C2221/05 (EP,US);
F17C2223/0153 (EP,US);
F17C2223/033 (EP,US);
F17C2223/043 (EP,US);
F17C2223/047 (EP,US);
F17C2227/044 (EP,US);
F17C2260/044 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/13] | F17C13/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/13] | Title | German: | Spülbarer Behälter | [2005/13] | English: | Purgeable container | [2005/13] | French: | Réservoir purgeable | [2005/13] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/19] | 07.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.04.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 07.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 04.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.09.2004 | AT | 03.12.2014 | BE | 03.12.2014 | BG | 03.12.2014 | CY | 03.12.2014 | CZ | 03.12.2014 | DK | 03.12.2014 | EE | 03.12.2014 | ES | 03.12.2014 | FI | 03.12.2014 | MC | 03.12.2014 | NL | 03.12.2014 | PL | 03.12.2014 | RO | 03.12.2014 | SE | 03.12.2014 | SI | 03.12.2014 | SK | 03.12.2014 | TR | 03.12.2014 | GR | 04.03.2015 | PT | 03.04.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/24] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
BE | 03.12.2014 | ||
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
MC | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
MC | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 03.12.2014 | |
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 03.12.2014 | |
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6431229 (BIRTCHER CHARLES MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1327603 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [X] 1-10* the whole document *; | [PX]EP1365041 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [PX] 1-10 * the whole document * |